Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | M Page Kelley |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10752 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 5:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 04/16 12:26 PM
Notice to defendant. (Vieira, Leonardo) |
|
9 | 9
order
Protective Order
Tue 04/16 12:25 PM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER(Vieira, Leonardo) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Tue 04/16 12:24 PM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered granting6 Motion for Discovery (Vieira, Leonardo) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 04/09 1:13 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stalzer, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Willianson, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Paige | ||
6 | 6
motion
Discovery
Tue 04/09 1:07 PM
MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/25 11:25 AM
Summons Issued as to John Doe. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/25 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report on the filing/termination of copyright case
Fri 03/22 4:59 PM
REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case .(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/22 4:57 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10331425 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |