Huntington National Bank, The v. JV SBAM SA LLC et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jane M Beckering |
Referred: | Ray Kent |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00305 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 5:10 PM EDT |
defendant
John R. Gibbs
|
|
defendant
JV SBAM SA LLC
|
|
defendant
Michael Ouaknine Living Trust Dated August 27, 2019
|
|
defendant
Michael Ouaknine
|
|
defendant
Diego Reyes
|
|
defendant
Gabriel P. Weinert
|
|
plaintiff
Huntington National Bank, The
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/26 1:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Huntington National Bank, The (Ejbeh, Joseph) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/26 9:41 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants John R. Gibbs, JV SBAM SA LLC, Michael Ouaknine Living Trust Dated August 27, 2019, Michael Ouaknine, Diego Reyes, Gabriel P. Weinert (mg) |
|
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 03/26 8:53 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ralph Colasuonno on behalf of plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The (Colasuonno, Ralph) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Mon 03/25 2:28 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (mg) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons (to be issued)
Mon 03/25 9:04 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Ejbeh, Joseph) |
|
service
Summons Not Issued
Mon 03/25 2:29 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants John R. Gibbs, JV SBAM SA LLC, Michael Ouaknine Living Trust Dated August 27, 2019, Michael Ouaknine, Diego Reyes, Gabriel P. Weinert (filing fee not paid) (mg) |
||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Mon 03/25 2:52 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7329269 (Ejbeh, Joseph) |
||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Huntington National Bank, The (Ejbeh, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I |