Manning #251889 v. Schiebner et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jane M Beckering |
Referred: | Ray Kent |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00300 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment Dismissing Case
Fri 04/05 2:10 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing Plaintiff's action without prejudice; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion to Withdraw
Fri 04/05 2:08 PM
ORDER granting motion to voluntarily withdraw5 ; this action is dismissed without prejudice; denying as moot motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis2 and motion to appoint counsel3 ; Judgment to issue; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 04/05 2:31 PM
Copy of Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,, Order on Motion to Withdraw,6 , Judgment Dismissing Case7 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Manning (slk) |
||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Withdraw
Tue 04/02 9:05 AM
MOTION to withdraw1 (letter format) by plaintiff Corey Manning #251889; (pjw) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Receipt of Case Notice
Fri 03/22 3:20 PM
NOTICE of receipt of case (ns) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 03/22 3:20 PM
MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Corey Manning #251889; (ns) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees
Fri 03/22 3:17 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Documents | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint with Magistrate Referral
Fri 03/22 3:14 PM
COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Corey Manning #251889 (ns) |
|
misc
Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case)
Fri 03/22 3:16 PM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from1 ) by plaintiff Corey Manning #251889 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (ns) |
||
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 03/22 3:22 PM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice4 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Manning #251889 (ns) |