Ayesh et al v. Garland et al
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J Vilardo |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00254 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 5:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Mr. Merrick Garland
|
|
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
|
Plaintiff
Ashwaq Alawi Ayesh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Khaled Alawi Elzahiri
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/23 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott L. Sroka on behalf of Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas (Sroka, Scott) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/29 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra George on behalf of Ashwaq Alawi Ayesh, Khaled Alawi Elzahiri (George, Alexandra) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/28 1:59 PM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Alexandra George, Esq. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 3/28/2024. (CMD) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 03/25 12:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, and U.S. Attorney General. (TMK) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/25 12:42 PM
Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) |
||
adr
Automatic Referral to Mediation
Mon 03/25 12:43 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] .' Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/25 12:43 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK) |
||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Continuation of Exhibits
Fri 03/22 2:53 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to3 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5136973.) .(Borowski, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Civility Oath, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement E-filing registration, | ||
Att: 4 Supplement Petition for Admission, | ||
Att: 5 Supplement Signed Sponsor Affidavit | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/22 2:51 PM
MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5136973.) by Ashwaq Alawi Ayesh, Khaled Alawi Elzahiri.(Borowski, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
service
Original Summons Filed
Fri 03/22 2:49 PM
Original Summons Filed.(Borowski, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 2:47 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5136950, filed by Ashwaq Alawi Ayesh, Khaled Alawi Elzahiri.(Borowski, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E |