Troetsch et al v. Blinken et al
Washington Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary K Dimke |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00090 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 2:18 PM PDT |
Defendant
Rena Bitter
|
|
Defendant
Antony J Blinken
|
|
Defendant
Eric Cohan
|
|
Defendant
Kent May
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
|
Defendant
Ken Salazar
|
|
Defendant
Wendy R Sherman
|
|
Defendant
Phillip Slattery
|
|
Defendant
Richard C Visek
|
|
Plaintiff
Laura Isela Troetsch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eduardo Troetsch Morales
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 04/26 10:26 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Stipulated Motion to Stay Deadlines, ECF No.15 . The parties move to extend the time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint to allow time for a consular interview. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Stipulated Motion to Stay Deadlines, ECF No. 15 , is GRANTED . The time for Defendants to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint is EXTENDED to July 5, 2024 . See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. TEXT ONLY ORDER / NO PDF DOCUMENT. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stay
Thu 04/25 3:06 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Stay Deadlines by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Smith, Molly) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Brooks on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Jacob Earl Brooks added to party Rena Bitter(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Earl Brooks added to party Antony J Blinken(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Earl Brooks added to party Eric Cohan(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Earl Brooks added to party Kent May(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Earl Brooks added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Earl Brooks added to party Ken Salazar(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Earl Brooks added to party Wendy R Sherman(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Earl Brooks added to party Phillip Slattery(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Earl Brooks added to party Richard C Visek(pty:dft))(Brooks, Jacob) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Molly Smith added to party Rena Bitter(pty:dft), Attorney Molly Smith added to party Antony J Blinken(pty:dft), Attorney Molly Smith added to party Eric Cohan(pty:dft), Attorney Molly Smith added to party Kent May(pty:dft), Attorney Molly Smith added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Molly Smith added to party Ken Salazar(pty:dft), Attorney Molly Smith added to party Wendy R Sherman(pty:dft), Attorney Molly Smith added to party Phillip Slattery(pty:dft), Attorney Molly Smith added to party Richard C Visek(pty:dft))(Smith, Molly) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 2:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Rena Bitter. (Quiroga, Hector) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 2:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Antony J Blinken. (Quiroga, Hector) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 2:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Richard C Visek. (Quiroga, Hector) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 2:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Phillip Slattery. (Quiroga, Hector) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 2:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Wendy R Sherman. (Quiroga, Hector) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 2:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Ken Salazar. (Quiroga, Hector) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 2:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Alejandro Mayorkas. (Quiroga, Hector) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 2:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Kent May. (Quiroga, Hector) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 2:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Eric Cohan. (Quiroga, Hector) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 2:54 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (BM, Case Administrator) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 11:31 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against Rena Bitter, Antony J Blinken, Eric Cohan, Kent May, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ken Salazar, Wendy R Sherman, Phillip Slattery, Richard C Visek ( Filing fee $ 405; Receipt # AWAEDC-4510206) Filed by Eduardo Troetsch Morales, Laura Isela Troetsch.(Soto, Destiny) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-3 | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 03/22 2:49 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (BM, Case Administrator) |