Kansas District Court
Judge:John W Broomes
Referred: Gwynne E Birzer
Case #: 6:24-cv-01051
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 5:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Angie Collins
Defendant
Gordon Fells
Defendant
Toby Grey
Defendant
Christopher A. Holzman
Defendant
Larry Linn
Defendant
Mulvane Police Department
Defendant
Kyle Newton
Defendant
Amber Roper
Defendant
M. Scnifffl
Defendant
Thomas Torske
Defendant
Pam Turner
Defendant
Phil Weiser
Defendant
Joy Williams
Plaintiff
Christopher Means
E-Filing & ECF Notifications PO Box 934
Derby, KS 67037

GPO Nov 07 2024
ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Although service of process would normally be undertaken by the clerk of court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3), the clerk is directed to stay service of process pending the District Court's screening of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/6/2024. (jal)
GPO Nov 07 2024
ORDER denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/6/2024. (jal)
GPO Nov 07 2024
ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is to file an Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Order which includes the facts requested in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/6/2024. (jal)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, November 07, 2024
8 8 6 pgs order Order Thu 11/07 8:44 AM
ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is to file an Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Order which includes the facts requested in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/6/2024. (jal)
Related: [-]
7 7 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Thu 11/07 8:41 AM
ORDER denying4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/6/2024. (jal)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 11/07 8:39 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Although service of process would normally be undertaken by the clerk of court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3), the clerk is directed to stay service of process pending the District Court's screening of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/6/2024. (jal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Wed 08/28 11:28 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Christopher Means is a registered pro se participant with e-filing & ECF notifications. (gw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
5 5 misc Docket Annotation Mon 03/25 11:09 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Christopher Means is a registered pro se participant with ECF notifications only. (gw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
4 4 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 03/22 4:10 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Christopher Means. Related [+] (jk)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/22 4:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christopher Means. Related [+] NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (jk)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer
Att: 1 Affidavit of Financial Status
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/22 4:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Christopher Means. (jk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/22 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Christopher Means. (jk)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 03/22 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff Christopher Means at PO Box 934 Derby, KS 67037 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
Related: [-]