Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Danny C Reeves
Case #: 5:24-cv-00078
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporti
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Terminated:Jan 02, 2025
Case in other court:Lincoln District Court, 24-C-00072
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 6:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Lower.com, LLC
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Plaintiff
Autumn Young
Represented By
James R. McKenzie
James R. Mckenzie Attorney, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dylan Young
Represented By
James R. McKenzie
James R. Mckenzie Attorney, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Arivo Acceptance, LLC
Terminated: 04/12/2024
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 06/21/2024
Represented By
John M. Williams
Williams Kilpatrick PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Hyundai Capital America, Inc.
Terminated: 06/21/2024
Represented By
Maxwell David Smith
Ward, Hocker & Thornton, Pllc - Lexington
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, January 02, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/02 3:11 PM
ORDER: 1. All claims asserted against Def Experian Information Solutions, Inc. are DISMISSED, w/ prejudice; 2. Except as otherwise agreed, the parties shall bear their respective costs, expenses and attorneys' fees; 3. All issues having been resolved, this action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/2/2025. (KMP)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/02 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dylan Young, Autumn Young (McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 12/18 4:51 PM
ORDER: w/in 30 days, Plaintiffs Dylan Young and Autumn Young are directed to tender a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, w/ prejudice. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/18/2024. (KMP)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Status Report Wed 12/18 11:36 AM
STATUS REPORT by Dylan Young, Autumn Young. (McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
20 20 order Status Report Order Mon 11/18 3:56 PM
ORDER: Plts directed to file status report re remaining claims against dft Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Noncompliance may result in dismissal of this matter, with prejudice, for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/18/2024.(STC)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order Terminate Motions Add and Terminate Parties Fri 06/21 2:14 PM
ORDER: 1.16 JOINT MOTION to Drop Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC as a Party and Dismiss Claims With Prejudice GRANTED; 2. plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC are DISMISSED, with prejudice. 3. parties subject to this Order will bear their respective costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees, with respect to the plaintiffs' claims against Equifax. 4. This Order does not affect the plaintiffs' claims against any other defendant. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/21/2024.(STC)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order Terminate Motions Add and Terminate Parties Fri 06/21 2:12 PM
ORDER: 1.17 JOINT MOTION to Drop Defendant Hyundai Capital America, Inc. as a Party and Dismiss Claims With Prejudice GRANTED; 2. plaintiffs' claims against defendant Hyundai are DISMISSED, with prejudice; 3. parties subject to this Order will bear their respective own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees, with respect to plaintiffs' claims against Hyundai. 4. This Order does not affect the plaintiffs' claims against any other defendant. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/21/2024.(STC)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/21 12:21 PM
JOINT MOTION to Drop Defendant Hyundai Capital America, Inc. as a Party and Dismiss Claims With Prejudice by Autumn Young, Dylan Young(McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/21 11:58 AM
JOINT MOTION to Drop Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC as a Party and Dismiss Claims With Prejudice by Autumn Young, Dylan Young(McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility File Submitted Fri 06/21 9:37 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review:15 Order (no response filed). (JLM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/21 2:07 PM
ORDER:1. The ptf's and dft's Hyundai Capital America, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai Motor Finance and Equifax Information Services, LLC are directed to tender a proposed agreed order of dismissal, with prejudice, w/in 30 days;2. This Order does not affect the ptf's claims against any other dft. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/21/2024.(KCF)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 05/21 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Autumn Young, Dylan Young (McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 05/14 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Hyundai Capital America, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai Motor Finance by Autumn Young, Dylan Young (McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
12 12 order Order ~Util - Update Answer Due Deadline Terminate Motions Fri 04/26 1:52 PM
GAVEL ORDER: GRANTING11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hyundai Capital America, Inc. The time within which the defendant may respond to the Complaint is extended through May 13, 2024. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/26/2024. (KMP) cc: COR. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/26/2024.(KMP)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/26 12:46 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hyundai Capital America, Inc.(Smith, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension
Friday, April 12, 2024
10 10 order Order ~Util - Update Answer Due Deadline Terminate Motions Fri 04/12 12:56 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time. Hyundai Captial America, Inc., may file it's Answer NLT 4/29/2024. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/12/2024. (KMP)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Add and Terminate Parties Terminate Motions Fri 04/12 12:31 PM
ORDER: 1. Ptffs' Motion7 is GRANTED; 2. The Ptffs' claims against Arivo Acceptance, LLC are DISMISSED, w/ prejudice; 3. The parties subject to the motion will bear their respective costs, expenses, and atty's fees, regarding the ptffs' claims against Arivo; 4. This Order does not affect the Ptffs' claims against any other Def. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/12/2024. (KMP)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/12 11:39 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hyundai Capital America, Inc.(Smith, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/12 11:13 AM
MOTION to Drop Defendant Arivo Acceptance, LLC as a Party and Dismiss Claims With Prejudice by Autumn Young, Dylan Young(McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 29, 2024
6 6 order ~Util - Update Answer Due Deadline Order Terminate Motions Fri 03/29 9:29 AM
ORDER: Defendant HCA's motion5 is GRANTED. HCA's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/29/2024. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/28 10:50 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hyundai Capital America, Inc.(Smith, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Thu 03/28 10:49 AM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hyundai Capital America, Inc.. (Smith, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/22 2:43 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE1 .(KCF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/22 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lincoln District Court, case number 24-C-00072. (Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5799059), filed by Hyundai Capital America, Inc.(KCF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Record,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Conflict Check Fri 03/22 2:37 PM
Conflict Check run. (KCF)
Related: [-]