In re: Request for Judicial Assistance
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph H L Perez-Montes |
Case #: | 3:24-mc-00032 |
Cause | 28:1782 Letter rogatory - appointment |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/05 10:39 AM
ORDER granting1 Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/5/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Jurisdictional Review Finding
Thu 04/04 4:02 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 4/4/2024. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/22 5:09 PM
MOTION Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782(a) by USA. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/22/2024.(Attorney Jabrina Clayton Edwards added to party USA(pty:mov))(aty,Edwards, Jabrina) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Jabrina C. Edwards, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Letters/Rogatory, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B - Subpoena to JP MorganChase Bank, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed order | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/03 10:07 AM
CASE Assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Whitener, M) |