California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:24-cv-01797
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Case in other court:Alameda County Superior Court, 24CV063701
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 3:12 AM PDT
Defendant
Los Angeles Times Communications LLC
Represented By
Hakop Stepanyan
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLC
contact info
Jason Jonathan Kim
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Ann Marie Mortimer
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Taliah Mirmalek
Represented By
L. Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
L Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Emily Ayres Horne
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info

GPO May 23 2024
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 11 Motion to Remand. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2024)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
35 35 misc Status Report Tue 02/11 3:33 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Mediation by Taliah Mirmalek, Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
34 34 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 01/13 10:26 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER To Stay Case Pending Mediation by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 33 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF) Modified on 1/13/2025 (kam2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
33 33 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 01/10 2:55 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY CASE PENDING MEDIATION filed by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 12/26 10:50 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***The judge's initials are incorrect for this filing. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge's name/initials on future filings.*** Re:32 Stipulation filed by Taliah Mirmalek, Los Angeles Times Communications LLC (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
32 32 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 12/23 3:30 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Taliah Mirmalek, Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/12 3:06 PM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Max S. Roberts. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
30 30 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 12/12 2:59 PM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 22 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
29 29 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 12/12 2:48 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS hearing set for December 20, 2024 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. The motion will be determined on the briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
28 28 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/03 4:04 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20106796.) filed by Taliah Mirmalek. (Roberts, Max)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
27 27 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 11/15 6:49 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re26 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byLos Angeles Times Communications LLC. Related [+] (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-] 26
26 26 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 11/15 6:44 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byLos Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-] 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint
Friday, November 01, 2024
25 25 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 11/01 11:47 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byTaliah Mirmalek. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-] 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint
Monday, October 07, 2024
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/07 2:42 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Responses due by 11/1/2024. Replies due by 11/15/2024. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 10/04 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jeff David Glasser on behalf of Los Angeles Times Communications LLC (Glasser, Jeff)
Related: [-]
23 23 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 10/04 3:12 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byLos Angeles Times Communications LLC. Related [+] (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-] 22
22 22 motion Dismiss Fri 10/04 3:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 12/20/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. Responses due by 10/18/2024. Replies due by 10/25/2024.(Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
21 21 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 08/21 2:50 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 20 Stipulation.A Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2025 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - To be determined. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
20 20 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 08/20 4:00 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint and Continue Case Management Conference filed by Taliah Mirmalek. (Horne, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 06/10 4:33 PM
STIPULATION to Further Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Civ. L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
18 18 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mon 06/03 2:00 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
17 17 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mon 06/03 12:38 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Horne, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 05/28 6:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - To be determined. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
15 15 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Thu 05/23 4:18 PM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 11 Motion to Remand. (crblc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
14 14 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 05/09 3:05 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byTaliah Mirmalek. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-] 11 MOTION to Remand
Thursday, May 02, 2024
13 13 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 05/02 2:07 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byLos Angeles Times Communications LLC.(Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-] 11 MOTION to Remand
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 19, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 04/19 12:11 PM
STIPULATION to Further Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Civ. L.R. 6-1(a)) (New due date: 7/1/2024) filed by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
11 11 motion Remand Thu 04/18 3:52 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by Taliah Mirmalek. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 5/2/2024. Replies due by 5/9/2024.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/27 9:22 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 03/27/2024.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 03/26 4:01 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 03/26 3:24 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Taliah Mirmalek.. (Horne, Emily)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 03/26 9:47 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
6 6 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 03/25 2:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC re1 Notice of Removal,2 Certificate of Interested Entities ; Notice to State Court of Removal; Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 03/25 2:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC (1) Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim; (2) Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California Re Contents of Joint Case Management Statement; (3) Notice of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial; (4) ECF Registration Information; (5) Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons; (6) Waiver of the Service of Summons (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 03/25 12:08 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Civ. L.R. 6-1(a)) (New deadline: 4/29/2024) filed by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 03/25 11:52 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/8/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 03/25 7:58 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Hakop Stepanyan. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 03/22 4:32 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC identifying Other Affiliate NantMedia Holdings, LLC for Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/22 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV063701. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19251517). Filed by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC.(Mortimer, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet