David v. Wasatch County Utah et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Howard C Nielson, Jr |
Referred: | Daphne A Oberg |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00215 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 5:11 PM MDT |
Defendant
Kendall Crittenden
|
|
Defendant
Wasatch County, Utah
|
|
Defendant
Jeff Wade
|
|
Defendant
Scott Sweat
|
|
Defendant
Luke Searle
|
|
Defendant
Erik Rowland
|
|
Defendant
Spencer Park
|
|
Defendant
Mark Nelson
|
|
Defendant
Karl McMillan
|
|
Defendant
Heber Lefgren
|
|
Defendant
Joey D Granger
|
|
Defendant
Dustin Grabau
|
|
Defendant
Danny Goode
|
|
Defendant
Natalie Foster
|
|
Defendant
Steve Farrell
|
|
Defendant
Marilyn Crittenden
|
|
Plaintiff
Lynn David
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/11 3:24 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by Defendants Kendall Crittenden, Marilyn Crittenden, Steve Farrell, Natalie Foster, Danny Goode, Dustin Grabau, Joey D Granger, Heber Lefgren, Karl McMillan, Mark Nelson, Spencer Park, Erik Rowland, Luke Searle, Scott Sweat, Jeff Wade, Wasatch County, Utah. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Trentadue, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse C Trentadue on behalf of Kendall Crittenden, Marilyn Crittenden, Steve Farrell, Natalie Foster, Danny Goode, Dustin Grabau, Joey D Granger, Heber Lefgren, Karl McMillan, Mark Nelson, Spencer Park, Erik Rowland, Luke Searle, Scott Sweat, Jeff Wade, Wasatch County, Utah (Trentadue, Jesse) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 04/11 4:47 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Based on the parties' stipulation and for good cause shown, Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to May 13, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/11/2024. No attached document. (gdr) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Wasatch County, Utah on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
36 | 36
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Steve Farrell on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
35 | 35
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Spencer Park on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
34 | 34
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Scott Sweat on 04/05/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
33 | 33
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Natalie Foster on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
32 | 32
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Mark Nelson on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
31 | 31
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Marilyn Crittenden on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
30 | 30
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Luke Searle on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
29 | 29
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Kendall Crittenden on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
28 | 28
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Karl McMillan on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
27 | 27
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Joey D. Granger on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
26 | 26
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Jeff Wade on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
25 | 25
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Heber Lefgren on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
24 | 24
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Erik Rowland on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
23 | 23
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Dustin Grabau on 04/01/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
22 | 22
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 3:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn David. Summons served on Danny Goode on 04/05/2024. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Fri 03/29 11:18 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeff Wade. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Fri 03/29 11:17 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Marilyn Crittenden. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 2:01 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Danny Goode. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 12:29 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Kendall Crittenden. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 12:28 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Joey D Granger. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 12:26 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Dustin Grabau. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 12:25 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Natalie Foster. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 12:24 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Steve Farrell. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 12:23 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Wasatch County, Utah. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 12:22 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Luke Searle. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 12:21 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Erik Rowland. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 12:20 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Mark Nelson. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 12:19 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Karl McMillan. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 12:18 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Heber Lefgren. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 12:17 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Scott Sweat. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/27 11:51 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Spencer Park. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order to Propose Schedule
Tue 03/26 3:01 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 03/26/2024. (haa) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/25 9:47 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 3/25/24. (dle) |
||
misc
Received Consent /Reassignment Form
Mon 03/25 1:57 PM
RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiff Lynn David. (mh) |
||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Fri 03/22 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Lynn David. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 4/12/2024. (kec) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Atty)
Fri 03/22 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5009019) filed by Lynn David. (Quist, Michelle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Claim, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - County Response Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 03/22 3:34 PM
Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00215-HCN. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec) |