Ehlert v. Somerset CPAS et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Shelby |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00217 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 4:36 AM MDT |
Defendant
Rebecca Quintana
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Somerset CPAS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley J. Ehlert
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() STIPULATED MODIFIED STANDARD PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 28 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/29/2024. (mh) |
|
28 | 28
![]() Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Bradley J. Ehlert. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Andrews, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() ORDER granting 26 Motion for Scheduling Order. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2025. Discovery due by 7/15/2025. Motions due by 8/15/2025. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/28/24. (haa) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Bradley J. Ehlert. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Andrews, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() AMENDED ANSWER to 19 Amended Complaint filed by Rebecca Quintana, Somerset CPAS. (Snow, John) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 07/25 9:58 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss as moot. The operative complaint in the litigation is Plaintiff's 19 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/25/2024. No attached document. (mh) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Rebecca Quintana, Somerset CPAS.(Snow, John) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's 19 Amended Complaint on or before July 23, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 7/9/2024. (mh) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re19 Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Rebecca Quintana, Somerset CPAS. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Snow, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MEMORANDUM in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Bradley J. Ehlert. (Andrews, Timothy) |
|
19 | 19
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bradley J. Ehlert with Jury Demand. filed by Bradley J. Ehlert. (Andrews, Timothy) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The filing time for Plaintiffs' amended answer and/or response to Defendants' 10 motion to dismiss is extended to June 24, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/10/2024. (mh) |
|
misc
Modification of Docket
Mon 06/10 9:52 AM
Modification of Docket re16 MOTION: Error: Pleading filed as a STIPULATION. Pleading is a motion to extend time to file a response to a motion to dismiss. Correction: Pleading event corrected to, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and text corrected. No further action needed. (mh) |
||
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() STIPULATION to Extend Filing Time by Bradley J. Ehlert.(Von Maack, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, June 03, 2024 | ||
misc
Received Consent /Reassignment Form
Mon 06/03 2:06 PM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Bradley J. Ehlert. (mh) |
||
utility
Reassignment to District Judge
Mon 06/03 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby and Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh) |
||
Wednesday, May 15, 2024 | ||
misc
Received Consent /Reassignment Form
Wed 05/15 10:32 AM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Rebecca Quintana and Somerset CPAS. (mh) |
||
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference
Tue 05/14 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Bradley J. Ehlert, Defendants Rebecca Quintana, Somerset CPAS. (alf) |
||
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Bradley J. Ehlert, Defendants Rebecca Quintana, Somerset CPAS. Form due by 6/3/2024. (mh) |
|
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Rebecca Quintana, Somerset CPAS. Attorney John A. Snow added to party Rebecca Quintana(pty:dft), Attorney John A. Snow added to party Somerset CPAS(pty:dft)(Snow, John) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradley J. Ehlert. Summons served on Somerset CPAS, P.C. on 03/29/2024. (Von Maack, Christopher) |
|
8 | 8
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradley J. Ehlert. Summons served on Rebecca Quintana on 04/04/2024. (Von Maack, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Timothy M. Andrews for Bradley J. Ehlert. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 3/26/2024. (mh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy M. Andrews , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5012149, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Bradley J. Ehlert.(Von Maack, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued Electronically as to Somerset CPAS. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued Electronically as to Rebecca Quintana. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 03/25/2024. (haa) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Rebecca Quintana, Somerset CPAS (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5009212) filed by Bradley J. Ehlert. (Von Maack, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Bradley J. Ehlert is directed to E-File the Complaint and civil cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kec) |