RKB Global Tax, LLC et al. v. Summer, et al.
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Derrick K Watson |
Referred: | Kenneth J Mansfield |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00136 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 2:09 PM HST |
Defendant
Ohana Acres, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Secret Falls Retreat, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Darcy Lee Summer
|
|
Plaintiff
RKB Global Tax, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/22 3:24 PM
Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by RKB Global Tax, LLC. (Arensmeyer, Frederick) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/22 3:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RKB Global Tax, LLC. (Arensmeyer, Frederick) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 3:06 PM
Summons Issued as to Darcy Lee Summer, Ohana Acres, LLC, Secret Falls Retreat LLC. (jni) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Fri 03/22 3:00 PM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (jni) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/22 2:58 PM
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Fri 03/22 2:57 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/20/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/22/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/22 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00136 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (jni) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 1:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Darcy Lee Summer, Ohana Acres, LLC, Secret Falls Retreat, LLC RKB Global Tax, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2978652.), filed by RKB Global Tax, LLC.(Arensmeyer, Frederick) Modified on 3/22/2024 (jni) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Demand for Trial By Jury, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |