California Southern District Court
Judge:Michael M Anello
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:24-cv-00552
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332ed Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02024-00004919-CU-OE-CTL
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 3:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Does 1 through 20
Defendant
Bram Granovsky
Represented By
Frank Magnanimo
Fisher Phillips LLP
contact info
Christine Ani Mardikian
Tharpe & Howell, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Moovel North America, LLC
Represented By
Frank Magnanimo
Fisher Phillips LLP
contact info
Christine Ani Mardikian
Tharpe & Howell, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Olga Wages
Represented By
Emilia Artemida Arutunian
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
John H. Gomez
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Chandler C. Roth
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Emilia A. Arutunian
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jonathan F. Kaldas
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info


Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago
Friday, January 10, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 01/10 2:39 PM
ORDER Granting19 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/10/25. (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
19 19 motion Dismiss Wed 01/08 1:20 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudice by Moovel North America, LLC. (Magnanimo, Frank)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
18 18 minutes Mandatory Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 12/18 9:25 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 12/17/2024 before the Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. The case is settled and the settlement was placed on the record. A Settlement Disposition Conference is set for 2/14/2024 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. To participate in the conference, counsel must dial 1-669-254-5252 and enter Meeting ID 161 634 0675. Participants will remain on hold until the Court activates the conference call. Participants will be prompted to enter the passcode, which is 953664, when the Court activates the call. The parties are to file a joint motion to dismiss the case if the settlement is finalized prior to the SDC, at which point the SDC will automatically be vacated without further notice from the Court.(no document attached) (itp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
17 17 notice Pretrial Disclosures Fri 12/13 12:05 PM
Pretrial Disclosures by Olga Wages (Roth, Chandler C.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/06 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Green on behalf of Moovel North America, LLC (Green, Olivia)Attorney Olivia Green added to party Moovel North America, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
15 15 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 11/01 10:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Status Conference held on 11/1/2024. (Plaintiff Attorney Emilia Arutunian). (Defendant Attorney Olivia Green). Attorney Green does not appear as counsel of record for defendants. She shall file a notice of appearance on or before 11/6/2023. Despite the Courts previous directions [Doc. No. 11 ], plaintiff's attorneys Jonathan Kaldas and Emilia Arutunian have not brought their CM/ECF credentials into compliance. Both attorneys shall ensure they are properly registered on CM/ECF no later than 11/6/2023. The Mandatory Settlement Conference is continued to 12/17/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. The MSC shall be conducted by Zoom. One week prior to the conference, counsel for all parties shall lodge confidential settlement briefs to the Court's efile inbox and simultaneously provide the names, email addresses, and telephone numbers of all conference participants. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (itp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Wed 09/18 9:23 AM
ORDER Granting13 Motion for Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Christine Ani Mardikian terminated. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/18/24. (aas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
13 13 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 09/17 3:38 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Proposed Order by Bram Granovsky, Moovel North America, LLC. (Magnanimo, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/10 10:02 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: Status Conference set for 11/1/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/18/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/9/24.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/10 9:26 AM
ORDER Re CM/ECF Credentials for Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/9/24.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference Tue 07/09 4:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 7/9/2024. Case Management Conference held on 7/9/2024. The Court will issue a written Scheduling Order.(no document attached) (itp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
9 9 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 07/02 1:51 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mardikian, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
8 8 5 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Tue 05/28 4:06 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/9/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 5/28/24.(aas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 05/24 4:49 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint by Moovel North America, LLC.(Mardikian, Christine)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/03 1:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Olga Wages. (Arutunian, Emilia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- CRD Complaint
Thursday, April 11, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) Thu 04/11 10:47 AM
ORDER Granting4 Joint Motion. Plaintiff to file First Amended Complaint on or before May 13, 2024.. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/11/24. (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
4 4 motion Miscellaneous (Other 1) Wed 04/10 5:22 PM
Joint MOTION Stipulation to Withdraw Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Permit Filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Bram Granovsky, Moovel North America, LLC. (Mardikian, Christine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
3 3 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/28 5:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bram Granovsky, Moovel North America, LLC.(Mardikian, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities
Friday, March 22, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 03/22 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Bram Granovsky, Moovel North America, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Strategic Mapping Inc. for Moovel North America, LLC. (rxc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/22 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18692738.), filed by Moovel North America, LLC, Bram Granovsky. The new case number is 3:24-cv-552-MMA-KSC. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Declaration of Heather Greenberg