Engineering Graphics, Inc.
Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Carlota M Bohm |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-20683 |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | May 31, 2024 |
Debtor
Engineering Graphics, Inc.
9 Brown Ave
Canonsburg, PA 15317-1728 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Pamela J. Wilson
810 Vermont Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15234 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Docket last updated: 03/23/2024 12:04 AM EDT |
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 7
Fri 03/22 9:38 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Engineering Graphics, Inc. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 04/5/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 05/31/2024. (Rice, David) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 03/22 9:59 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 24-20683 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16676386, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29
Fri 03/22 10:00 AM
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor Engineering Graphics, Inc. (Rice, David) |
|
4 | 4
court
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Fri 03/22 1:56 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing . (culy) |
|
5 | 5
utility
Update Other Deadlines -BK-
Fri 03/22 1:57 PM
Deadlines Updated . Government Proof of Claim due by 9/18/2024. (culy) |