Marcano et al v. Orange County Sheriff Office et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Julie S Sneed |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00571 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kenneth Dale
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Orange County Sheriff Office
|
|
Defendant
Samir Paulino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marlon Marcano
|
|
Plaintiff
Yma Su-Ling
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
misc
Pay Fee
Thu 04/18 2:46 PM
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21999222 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Daryl K. Washington. (Feiler, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/16 4:45 PM
NOTICE by Kenneth Dale, Orange County Sheriff Office, Samir Paulino NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING UPDATE TO 3.01(g) CERTIFICATION IN MOTION TO DISMISS (Moes, Brian) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
Mon 04/15 3:32 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiffs may respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by May 6, 2024. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 15, 2024. (DAD) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
Sun 04/14 8:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ,8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Feiler, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 04/10 10:26 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Daryl K. Washington Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Pay the Special Admission Fee. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RN) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 5:39 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Orange County Sheriff Office. (Bogan, Bruce) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 5:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Order by Marlon Marcano, Yma Su-Ling Scarbriel. (Feiler, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/09 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brian Francis Moes on behalf of Kenneth Dale, Samir Paulino. Lead Counsel: Brian F. Moes. (Moes, Brian) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 04/09 4:55 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kenneth Dale, Samir Paulino. Related case(s): Yes (Moes, Brian) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 4:52 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kenneth Dale, Samir Paulino. (Moes, Brian) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/09 2:32 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice provided counsel shall register for and use the Court's electronic filing system. Counsel can register for a CM/ECF login password through the website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under "CM/ECF." Counsel are cautioned that all future motions that fail to comply with any Local Rule, including the typography requirements found in Local Rule 1.08, may be denied on that basis alone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 4/9/2024. (JBS) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/09 1:41 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Daryl K. Washington to appear pro hac vice by Marlon Marcano, Yma Su-Ling Scarbriel. (Feiler, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/05 5:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Kenneth Dale, Samir Paulino. (Moes, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order to comply with electronic filing
Wed 04/03 8:28 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Daryl Washington to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 4/3/2024. (GNB) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Tue 03/26 12:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Orange County Sheriff Office. (Bogan, Bruce) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 03/26 11:03 AM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 03/26 11:03 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Daryl K. Washington Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
5 | 5
13
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/26 10:45 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Julie S. Sneed on 3/26/2024. (GNB) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 03/26 10:21 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendants' 3 Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Deadline to Respond to Complaint. Defendants may respond to the complaint on or before April 5, 2024. Signed by District Judge Julie S. Sneed on March 26, 2024. (DAD) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Mon 03/25 5:31 PM
Time Sensitive MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal (with Complaint attached) by Kenneth Dale, Samir Paulino. (Moes, Brian) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/25 2:27 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to District Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-571-JSS-RMN. (RLK) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/22 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2023-CA-015475-O filed in State Court on September 25, 2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21902766 filed by Samir Paulino, Kenneth Dale.(Moes, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |