Chauncy v. Gorden
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Roy B Dalton, Jr |
Referred: | Embry J Kidd |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00573 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dennis Lee Gorden
|
|
Plaintiff
Charles Steven Chauncy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
utility
*Remark
Fri 04/26 10:11 AM
Remark: Doc.13 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/26/2024. (JWG) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/24 8:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dennis Lee Gorden. (Burt, David) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 04/24 8:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dennis Lee Gorden.(Burt, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendants Exhibits 1-10, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendants Exhibits 11-20, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Defendants Exhibits 21-31 | ||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/09 11:34 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dennis Lee Gorden with Jury Demand. filed by Charles Steven Chauncy.(Allison, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 04/03 9:20 AM
It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Tuesday, April 16, 2024, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint correcting the deficiency identified in this Order. Failure to timely file will result in this action being closed without further notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/3/2024. (ALL) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
12
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/27 12:43 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/27/2024. (ALL) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
utility
*Remark
Tue 03/26 3:21 PM
Remark: Doc.4 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/26/2024. (JWG) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/26 7:46 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/26/2024. (JOR) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons issued
Mon 03/25 3:27 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Dennis Lee Gorden. (KME) |
|
5 | 5
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/25 12:51 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-573-RBD-EJK. (AA) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/22 9:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Charles Steven Chauncy. (Allison, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/22 8:30 PM
NOTICE by Charles Steven Chauncy of Pendency of Other Actions (Allison, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of appearance
Fri 03/22 8:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Charles Allison on behalf of Charles Steven Chauncy (Allison, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 8:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Dennis Lee Gorden with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21902906) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Allison, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |