Hudgins-Verellen v. Officer et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William F Jung |
Referred: | Christopher P Tuite |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00712 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Supplement
Tue 04/16 3:15 PM
SUPPLEMENT re5 Amended Complaint, by Sylvia Hope Hudgins-Verellen.***Received only page 1 and 2***(LD) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 2:04 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 6 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within THIRTY DAYS of the date of this order, Ms. Hudgins-Verellen must either (1) file a fully completed Affidavit of Indigency form or (2) pay the $405.00 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send Ms. Hudgins-Verellen an Affidavit of Indigency form. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/9/2024. (MWC) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 8:48 AM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sylvia Hope Hudgins-Verellen.(AA) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/09 8:47 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against P. Digaetano, C. Faulkingham, Hernando County Jail, Longobardi Terminating FNU Officer filed by Sylvia Hope Hudgins-Verellen. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Sylvia Hope Hudgins-Verellen.(AA) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/03 11:32 AM
NOTICE to the Court by Sylvia Hope Hudgins-Verellen(AM) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/25 11:10 AM
ORDER dismissing without prejudice 1 Complaint; denying without prejudice 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Ms. Hudgins-Verellen wishes to amend, she shall file an amended complaint within THIRTY DAYS of the date of this order. In addition, within THIRTY DAYS of the date of this order, Ms. Hudgins-Verellen must either (1) file a fully completed Affidavit of Indigency form or (2) pay the $405.00 filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail to Ms. Hudgins-Verellen an Affidavit of Indigency form and the standard form for pro se prisoner complaints. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/25/2024. (MWC) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/22 3:23 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sylvia Hope Hudgins-Verellen.(LD) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT against FNU Officer, FNU Officer filed by Sylvia Hope Hudgins-Verellen. ***Service copies provided***(LD) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope |