Mortti v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Merryday |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00730 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc
|
|
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
|
|
Defendant
VyStar Credit Union
|
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Mortti
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of settlement
Tue 04/23 11:36 AM
NOTICE of settlement as to Defendant Experian by Ryan Mortti (Lane, Gerald) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 12:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Long, Charlotte) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Mon 04/22 12:15 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Trans Union LLC. Related case(s): No (Long, Charlotte) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/22 12:12 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Long, Charlotte) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 04/22 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Charlotte A. Long on behalf of Trans Union LLC. Lead Counsel: Charlotte Long, Esq.. (Long, Charlotte) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 04/11 3:57 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Equifax Information Services, LLC, moves (Doc. 8) unopposed to extend the time within which Equifax may respond to the complaint. The motion is GRANTED. No later than May 13, 2024, Equifax may respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/11/2024. (AP) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Wed 04/10 2:30 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Equifax Information Services LLC. Related case(s): No (Joffe, Jason) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 2:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Joffe, Jason) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Wed 04/10 2:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Joffe, Jason) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 04/10 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason Daniel Joffe on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. Lead Counsel: Jason Daniel Joffe. (Joffe, Jason) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 03/28 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Gerald D Lane, Jr on behalf of Ryan Mortti. Lead Counsel: Gerald D Lane, Jr. (Lane, Gerald) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Mon 03/25 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (LV) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Mon 03/25 10:23 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC, VyStar Credit Union. (MCB) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 03/25 8:25 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jibrael Hindi and Jennifer Simil of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/25 8:24 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:24-cv-730-SDM-UAM. (ARL) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 6:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Trans Union LLC, VyStar Credit Union with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21902856) filed by Ryan Mortti.(Simil, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons |