Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Amy Totenberg
Referred: Linda T Walker
Case #: 1:24-cv-01241
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Myia A Stephens
and all other occupants 300 Amhurst Pkwy
College Park, GA 30349
Plaintiff
Progress Residential Borrower 17, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Franklin Totten
The Totten Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/26 12:07 PM
NOTICE to State Court of Fulton County re5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (dob) (dob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/26/2024) Receipted Filing
5 5 3 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Tue 03/26 11:45 AM
ORDER adopting3 Final Report and Recommendation; remanding case to the State Court of Fulton County. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/26/2024. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 03/26 10:27 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Myia A Stephens re3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal, filed by Myia A Stephens,4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 03/26 11:45 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Myia A Stephens re5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 03/27 1:39 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (hfm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Tue 03/26 10:26 AM
ORDER for Service of3 Order ruling on IFP, Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 3/25/2024. (dob)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Order ruling on IFP Tue 03/26 10:24 AM
ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis, FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending2 Notice of Removal, filed by Myia A Stephens be remanded to the State Court of Fulton County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 3/25/2024. (dob)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 03/26 10:22 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Myia A Stephens.(dob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Friday, March 22, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/22 11:14 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/22 11:13 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Myia A Stephens.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet