Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey J Helmick
Referred: Darrell A Clay
Case #: 3:24-cv-00534
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Petitioner
Ronald Dean Lauck
Respondent
Kenneth Black

GPO Mar 31 2025
Report and Recommendation. I recommend the District Court dismiss the portion of Ground Three arguing ineffective assistance of counsel as procedurally defaulted; deny Ground One, Ground Two, and the remainder of Ground Three as meritless; and dismiss the petition. I further recommend the District Court deny Mr. Lauck a certificate of appealability on all grounds.re 1. Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 4/14/2025. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/31/2025. (R,Ke)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
21 21 oth_ans Response/Reply/Sur-Reply Fri 05/02 4:56 PM
Response Opposition to Objections to Report & Recommendation (Doc. 20) filed by Kenneth Black. Related document(s)20 . (Mullin, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
20 20 oth_ans Objection to Report and Recommendation Fri 04/18 1:47 PM
Objection to Magistrates March 31st, 2025 Report and Recommendation filed by Ronald Dean Lauck. Related document(s)19 . (K,AR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, March 31, 2025
19 19 order Report and Recommendation Mon 03/31 3:42 PM
Report and Recommendation. I recommend the District Court dismiss the portion of Ground Three arguing ineffective assistance of counsel as procedurally defaulted; deny Ground One, Ground Two, and the remainder of Ground Three as meritless; and dismiss the petition. I further recommend the District Court deny Mr. Lauck a certificate of appealability on all grounds.re1 . Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 4/14/2025. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/31/2025. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Mon 03/31 3:48 PM
Copy of19 Report and Recommendation, mailed to Ronald Dean Lauck, A798467, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 3/31/2025. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for order Wed 03/19 3:38 PM
Order denying Petitioner's17 Motion to Expedite/Accelerate the Calendar. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/19/2025.(R,Ke)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Wed 03/19 3:41 PM
Copy of18 Order on Motion mailed to Ronald Dean Lauck, A798467, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 3/19/2025. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
17 17 2 pgs motion Order Mon 03/17 2:09 PM
Motion to Expedite/Accelerate the Calendar filed by Petitioner Ronald Dean Lauck.(H,JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, November 18, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for order Mon 11/18 2:53 PM
Order denying as moot Petitioner's9 Motion to Expand the Record, and10 Motion to include exhibits and expand the record pursuant to rule 7(a) and 7(b), given that Mr. Lauck has already supplemented the record with the two the items he requested. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 11/18/2024.(R,Ke)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Mon 11/18 2:56 PM
Copy of16 Order on Motions for orders mailed to Ronald Dean Lauck, A798467, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 11/18/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
15 15 resp Reply Fri 10/18 11:38 AM
Reply to Respondent's Response to Motion to Expand the Record filed by Petitioner Ronald Dean Lauck. Related [+]. (H,AR)
Related: [-] . Nos.9 &14
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
14 14 resp Response Tue 10/15 12:08 PM
Response to10 Motion to include exhibits and expand the record pursuant to rule 7(a) and 7(b),9 Motion filed by Kenneth Black. (Mullin, Katherine)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for leave Tue 10/15 10:32 AM
Order [non-document] granting Respondent's13 Motion for leave to File Amended Response to Petitioner's Motion to Expand Record. Respondent must separately filed the Amended Response on the Courts docket. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 10/15/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Tue 10/15 10:34 AM
Copy of NEF of non-document Order on Motion for leave, mailed to Ronald Dean Lauck, A798467, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 10/15/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
13 13 motion Leave Mon 10/14 3:54 PM
Motion for leave to File Amended Response to Petitioner's Motion to Expand Record (Doc. (9 & 10) filed by Respondent Kenneth Black. Related document(s)10 ,9 . (Attachments: #1 Amended Response to Petitioner's Motion to Expand Record (Doc. 9 & 10))(Mullin, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
12 12 oth_ans Traverse to Return of Writ Mon 09/30 1:40 PM
Traverse to7 Return of Writ filed by Ronald Dean Lauck. (R,EM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet 2020 CR 00245,
Att: 2 Docket Sheet 2021 CR 00249,
Att: 3 Envelope
11 11 resp Response Mon 09/30 11:52 AM
Response to10 Motion to include exhibits and expand the record pursuant to rule 7(a) and 7(b),9 Motion Opposition to Motion to Expand Record filed by Kenneth Black. (Mullin, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
10 10 2 pgs motion Order Wed 09/25 11:38 AM
Request to include exhibits and expand the record pursuant to rule 7(a) and 7(b) filed by Petitioner Ronald Dean Lauck.(L,Br)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Case No. CR-254 Docket Sheets,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Case No. CR-245 July 8, 2021 Motion to Dismiss Pleading,
Att: 3 Envelope
Thursday, September 12, 2024
order Order Thu 09/12 5:00 PM
Order [non-document] Respondent is directed to file a response to Petitioner's9 Motion to Expand the Record no later than September 30, 2024. No reply brief is authorized unless specifically ordered by the Court. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 9/12/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Thu 09/12 5:02 PM
Copy of NEF of non-document Order, mailed to Ronald Dean Lauck, A798467, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 9/12/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
9 9 2 pgs motion Order Mon 09/09 3:46 PM
Motion to Expand the Record filed by Petitioner Ronald Dean Lauck.(W,Jo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, August 29, 2024
8 8 motion Extension (other) Thu 08/29 11:55 AM
Motion for extension of time of 30 days to file traverse pursuant to rule 5(e) filed by Petitioner Ronald Dean Lauck. Related document(s)7 .(L,Br)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2 - Richland Correctional Institution Library Time Limit,
Att: 2 Envelope
order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Thu 08/29 2:11 PM
Order [non-document] granting Petitioner's8 Motion for extension of time to file traverse pursuant to rule 5(e). Petitioner must file his Traverse to Return of Writ no later than September 16, 2024. Respondent may file a Sur-Reply within 15 days after Petitioner's Traverse is filed on the Court's docket. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 8/29/2024.(R,Ke)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Thu 08/29 2:17 PM
Copy of NEF of non-document Order on Motion for extension of time, mailed to Ronald Dean Lauck, A798467, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 8/29/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
7 7 answer Return of Writ (2254) Thu 08/08 5:35 PM
Return of Writ (2254)1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), filed by Kenneth Black.(Mullin, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Record Exhibits 1-32 Bookmarked,
Att: 2 Transcript of Pre-Trial Motions of 10/27/21,
Att: 3 Transcripts of Pre-Trial Motions of 12/14/21,
Att: 4 Transcript Jury Waiver of 2/9/22,
Att: 5 Volume(s) Transcript of Trial- Vol. I,
Att: 6 Volume(s) Transcript of Trial- Vol. II,
Att: 7 Volume(s) Transcript of Trial- Vol. III,
Att: 8 Volume(s) Transcript of Trial- Vol. IV,
Att: 9 Transcript of Verdict of 3/2/22,
Att: 10 Transcript of Sentencing of 3/29/22
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Tue 06/18 10:31 AM
Order [non-document] granting Respondent's6 Motion for extension of time to answer1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Kenneth Black answer due 8/9/2024. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 6/18/2024.(R,Ke)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Tue 06/18 10:32 AM
Copy of NEF of non-document Order on Motion for extension of time to answer mailed to Ronald Dean Lauck, A798467, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 6/18/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
6 6 motion Extension (answer complaint) Mon 06/17 5:56 PM
Second Motion for extension of time until August 9, 2024 to answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Kenneth Black. (Mullin, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 05/02 1:53 PM
Attorney Appearance by Katherine E. Mullin filed by on behalf of Kenneth Black. (Mullin, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
4 4 order Magistrate Judges Initial Order Thu 04/25 11:23 AM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Respondent shall file an Answer Related [+] to the petition within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. The Answer shall comply with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases and shall address all legal issues raised in the petition. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the filing of Respondent's Return of Writ to reply thereto by filing a Traverse. Respondent shall have fifteen (15) days from the filing of Petitioner's Traverse to respond thereto by filing a sur-reply. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 4/25/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-] turn of Writ
order Automatic Reference of Administrative Action Thu 04/25 10:12 AM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/25/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Thu 04/25 11:25 AM
Copy of4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order, mailed to Ronald Dean Lauck A798467 Richland Correctional Institution P.O. Box 8107 Mansfield, OH 44901, and emailed to the Office of the Attorney General with1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus on 4/25/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
oth_evt Financial Transaction Wed 04/24 1:21 PM
Financial Transaction in the amount of $5.00 received from Ronald Lauck. Receipt # 14314. (S,DM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/17 11:25 AM
Order . Petitioner is hereby ordered, within 30 days of the date of this order, either to pay the $5.00 filing fee or to file a proper application to proceed in forma pauperis in order to proceed with this case. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 4/17/2024.(R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP application
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Wed 04/17 12:10 PM
Copy of3 Order, mailed to Ronald Dean Lauck A798467 Richland Correctional Institution P.O. Box 8107 Mansfield, OH 44901 on 4/17/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Fri 03/22 10:50 AM
Copy of2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), mailed to Ronald Dean Lauck at A798467 Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 3/22/2024. Related document(s)2 ,1 . (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
2 2 order Administrative Track DCM Initial Order Fri 03/22 10:47 AM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) Fri 03/22 10:36 AM
Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid. Filed by Ronald Dean Lauck. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Excerpt of Transcript,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Personal A/C Withdraw Slip,
Att: 4 Envelope
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 03/22 10:37 AM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 03/22 10:37 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (F,AW)
Related: [-]