Falcon Fulfillment v. Best Life Journey et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Howard C Nielson, Jr |
Referred: | Dustin B Pead |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00218 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 2:22 AM MDT |
Defendant
Best Life Journey, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Todd Tzeng
|
|
Plaintiff
Falcon Fulfillment, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
misc
Received Consent /Reassignment Form
Mon 04/15 3:33 PM
RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiff Falcon Fulfillment, Inc. (mh) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/08 12:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Falcon Fulfillment, Inc (Merrill, Brittany) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/08 12:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Falcon Fulfillment, Inc (Merrill, Brittany) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order to Propose Schedule
Thu 03/28 12:24 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 03/28/2024. (haa) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/27 1:54 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/27/24. (dle) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Mon 03/25 8:21 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Falcon Fulfillment, Inc. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 4/15/2024. (kec) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 03/25 8:20 AM
Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00218-HCN. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec) |
||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty)
Fri 03/22 5:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Falcon Fulfillment, Inc. (Tejeda, Engels) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Atty)
Fri 03/22 5:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5009321) filed by Falcon Fulfillment, Inc. (Tejeda, Engels) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 2015 Consulting Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 2017-2019 Amendments, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Amendment to January 1, 2019 Consulting Services Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |