California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00983
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 12:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Juan Perez (1)
Represented By
J. Alejandro Barrientos
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 12:32 PM PDT
Thursday, February 22, 2024
1 1 1 pgs AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant Juan Perez, originating in the Western District of New York. Defendant charged in violation of: 21:846. Signed by agent Stellern, USMS, DUSM. USA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Juan Perez; defendants Year of Birth: 1988; date of arrest: 2/20/2024 USMS# REG 00500-511 (mhe)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Defendant Juan Perez arrested on warrant issued by the USDC Western District of New York at Rochester.(mhe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charging Documents
4 4 5 pgs NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Juan Perez (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo as to Defendant Juan Perez. Contested detention hearing held,granting4 REQUEST for Detention as to Juan Perez (1). Defendant arraigned and states true name is as charged. Attorney: J. Alejandro Barrientos for Juan Perez, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders defendant Temporarily detained. Defendant remanded to the custody or currently in the custody of the US Marshal. Detention Hearing set for 2/27/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. Court Smart: CS 2/22/24. (mhe)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS filed by Defendant Juan Perez (mhe)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Juan Perez. (mhe)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS filed by Defendant Juan Perez (mhe)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs WAIVER OF RIGHTS approved by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo as to Defendant Juan Perez. (mhe)
Related: [-]
11 11 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Juan Perez. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mhe)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Juan Perez, declaring that I have been issued a passport or other travel document(s), but they are not currently in my possession. I will surrender any passport or other travel document(s) issued to me, to the U.S. Pretrial Services Agency by the deadline imposed. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (mhe)
Related: [-]