Indiana Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00008
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 3:29 AM EDT
Defendant
PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1)
Represented By
Chad E. Groves
Groves Law LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
USM (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Todd Stanton Shellenbarger
United States Attorney'S Office (evansville)
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/23/2024 4:14 AM EDT
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT & AFFIDAVIT approved and signed by Judge District Judge Matthew P Brookman, as to PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1). Electronic Notice to USM-W. (DWH) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
2 2 PENALTY SHEET as to PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1). (DWH) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Todd Stanton Shellenbarger appearing for USA. (DWH) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
5 5 Notice of Readiness for Initial Appearance by USA as to PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1) (Shellenbarger, Todd) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
6 6 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Initial Appearance on Complaint held on 8/8/2023. The government appears by AUSA Kristian Mukoski. Defendant appears in person and by CJA counsel, Chad Groves. The United States Probation Office is represented by Courtney Price. Defendant submits a financial affidavit, and counsel is appointed.Defendant waives reading of the Complaint in open court. The Court advises the defendant of his rights, charges and possible penalties, and the defendant and the government of their rights and obligations pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act. The Court advises the defendant of his right to consular notification. Defendant waives his right to a Probable Cause hearing and executes a waiver of preliminary hearing. The government moves for detention. Defendant waives his rights to a detention hearing and executes a wavier of detention. The Court orders defendant detained pending further proceedings.The defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Signed by District Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (Court Reporter Amy Hooten) (LES) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1) (JRB) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1). (JRB) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
10 10 Order Appointing CJA Counsel Chad Groves as to PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1). Such appointment shall be deemed effective as of 8/4/2023. Signed by District Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/8/2023. (JRB) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 5(F) as to PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1) - SEE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/8/2023. (JRB) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
13 13 ARREST Warrant Returned by US Marshal. Service of Warrant EXECUTED on 8/8/2023 in case as to PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1). Electronic Notice to USM-W.(AAS) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
14 14 Joint MOTION for Enlargement of Time for Indictment by USA as to PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1).(Shellenbarger, Todd) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order for Enlargement of Time for Indictment
Friday, September 08, 2023
15 15 Notice of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Crystal S. Wildeman. Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number (3:23-mj-00044-CSW), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (Albertson, Steven) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict to 12/6/2023 as to PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Crystal S. Wildeman on 9/8/2023.(JRB) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
17 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to March 5, 2024 by USA as to PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1).(Shellenbarger, Todd) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order for Enlargement of Time to Indictment
Friday, November 03, 2023
18 18 ORDER ON SECOND JOINT MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR INDICTMENT - granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to File as to PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1). The government is granted an enlargement of time for Indictment of 90 days, up to and including March 5, 2024, and that this time is excluded from the Speedy Trial Act time limits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Crystal S. Wildeman on 11/3/2023.(KAA) [3:23-mj-00044-CSW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
19 19 INDICTMENT as to PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1) count 1. Electronic notice to USM-W. (JSR)
Related: [-]
22 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Todd Stanton Shellenbarger appearing for USA. (JSR)
Related: [-]
23 23 PENALTY SHEET as to PABLO LOPEZ-ROMERO (1). (JSR)
Related: [-]