New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00158
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Terminated:Feb 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 3:24 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Megan Larkin
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Joshua William Vasquez (1)
Terminated: 02/22/2024
Represented By
Lance Lazzaro
Lazzaro Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/23/2024 4:19 AM EDT
Thursday, February 22, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom : Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Joshua William Vasquez held on 2/22/2024. (FTR Log #2;46-2;55.) AUSA Megan Larkin present. Defendant present w/ retain counsel Lance Lazzaro. Defendant arraigned on a removal complaint to the ED of Virginia. Gov't opposed bail. Defendant did not make a bail application and consent to detention. Commitment order of ED of VA entered. Defendant waived identity hearing. (SY)
Related: [-]
1 1 RULE 40 AFFIDAVIT / removal complaint to the Eastern District of Virginia by USA as to Joshua William Vasquez. Signed by Judge Lois Bloom dtd 2/22/24. (SY)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lance Lazzaro appearing for Joshua William Vasquez (SY)
Related: [-]
3 3 Letter dtd 2/22/24 from AUSA Megan Larkin to Judge Lois Bloom opposing bail as to Joshua William Vasquez. (SY)
Related: [-]
4 4 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Joshua William Vasquez. Defendant committed to District of Eastern District of Virginia.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 2/22/2024. (SY)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing by Joshua William Vasquez (SY)
Related: [-]
6 6 Notice to Eastern District of Virginia of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Joshua William Vasquez. Docket sheet and documents attached. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to [InterDistrictTransfer_NYED@nyed.uscourts.gov]. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (SY)
Related: [-]