California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 5:24-cv-01801
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Terminated:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 3:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Dell Marketing GP L.L.C.
Defendant
Dell Marketing L.P.
Defendant
Dell Technologies Inc.
Plaintiff
Leslie Harlien
Represented By
Andrew Edward Saxon
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Anthony Michael Isola
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 05, 2024
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 04/05 4:33 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 04/05 4:28 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Leslie Harlien.. (Isola, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
6 6 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 03/26 8:42 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Leslie Harlien identifying Other Affiliate Dell Marketing Corporation, Other Affiliate Lenovo (United States) Inc., Other Affiliate Dell Technologies Inc., Other Affiliate Dell Marketing GP L.L.C., Other Affiliate Dell Marketing LP L.L.C., Other Affiliate Dell Marketing L.P. for Leslie Harlien. Plaintiff Leslie Harlien`s Certification Of Conflicts And Interested Entities Or Persons (Isola, Anthony)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 03/26 12:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Dell Technologies Inc., Dell Marketing L.P., Dell Marketing GP L.L.C. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 03/26 11:38 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . INTERESTED ENTITIES - NAME(S) NOT ENTERED: Names of non-party interested entities or persons MUST be entered at the prompt. [err102] Re:3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Leslie Harlien This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety, and add the case number to the caption page. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 03/25 8:28 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/8/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
3 3 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 03/22 7:28 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Leslie Harlien Certification of Conflicts and Interested Entities or Persons (Isola, Anthony)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Proposed Summons Fri 03/22 7:21 PM
Proposed Summons. (Isola, Anthony)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/22 7:18 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, DECLARATORY, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19252124.). Filed by Leslie Harlien.(Isola, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Exhibit A (Dell Employment Agreement),
Att: 2 7 pgs Exhibit B (2019 RSU Agreement),
Att: 3 7 pgs Exhibit C (2020 RSU Agreement),
Att: 4 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet