California Southern District Court
Judge:Marilyn L Huff
Referred: Barbara Lynn Major
Case #: 3:24-cv-00546
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441pi Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Terminated:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Amazon, Inc.
Represented By
Kevin S. Asfour
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Robert W. Sparkes, III
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Jennifer Janeira Nagle
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Marvis A. Barnes
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Loly Garcia Tor
K&l Gates
contact info
Defendant
Nutra Holdings Two, Inc.
Represented By
Carol R. Brophy
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nutra Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Carol R. Brophy
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Williams
Plaintiff
Russell Stephen
Represented By
Gregory S. Weston
The Weston Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, October 28, 2024
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 10/28 11:19 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss and Directing the clerk to close the case[Doc. No.39 ]. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/28/2024. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
39 39 motion Dismiss Wed 10/09 10:38 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by Russell Stephen. (Weston, Gregory) (mjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Change Venue Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 09/23 2:14 PM
ORDER: (1) Denying Defendant Amazons Motion to Change Venue and Motion to Dismiss As Moot In Light of Settlement; and [Doc. Nos.14 ,15 ] (2) Vacating Briefing Schedule In Light of Settlement. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 09/23/2024. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
37 37 2 pgs order Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 09/17 3:53 PM
Order Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion for Dismissal. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 11/14/2024. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 11/14/2024, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 11/21/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major.Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 09/17/2024.(mjw)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 09/17 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Amazon, Inc. (Asfour, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
35 35 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 08/23 9:59 AM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference [ECF No.34 ].Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference Continued to 10/3/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major.Joint Discovery Plan due 9/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 08/23/2024. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
34 34 motion Continue Thu 08/22 1:06 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and related dates by Amazon, Inc.. (Asfour, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 08/08 11:54 AM
ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing Dates and Setting Briefing Schedule[Doc.No.32 ]. Motion to Transfer Venue Hearing Continued to 10/7/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Motion to Dismiss Hearing Continued to 10/28/2024 at 10:30AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Any reply in support of Amazon's Motion to Dismiss is due by 10/21/2024. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 08/07/2024. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
32 32 motion Continue Tue 08/06 4:54 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Motion Hearings and Amend Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss by Amazon, Inc.. (Asfour, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Thu 08/01 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Russell Stephen . No Parties With Financial Interest.(Weston, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/30 4:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Russell Stephen.(Weston, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Russell Stephen,
Att: 2 Declaration of Gregory S. Weston and Exs. 1-4 thereto,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
29 29 8 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Tue 07/30 9:31 AM
Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference.Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major.Joint Discovery Plan due 8/30/2024.Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 07/30/2024.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
28 28 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/29 2:41 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Amended by Plaintiff by Nutra Holdings Two, Inc., Nutra Holdings, Inc..(Brophy, Carol)Attorney Carol R. Brophy added to party Nutra Holdings Two, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Carol R. Brophy added to party Nutra Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft)**QC Email sent. Documents Not Timely. ** (mjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 04, 2024
27 27 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/04 1:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Russell Stephen. John Williams served. (Weston, Gregory)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/04 1:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Russell Stephen. Nutra Holdings, Inc. served. (Weston, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
25 25 service Summons Issued Thu 06/20 11:11 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 06/10 2:26 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Amazon, Inc.. (Asfour, Kevin)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 06/10 12:36 PM
ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing Dates and Setting Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Reply due by 7/29/2024. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Response due by 07/29/2024. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 06/10/2024. (mjw)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Continue Mon 06/10 7:56 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Hearings on Motion to Transfer Venue and Motion to Dismiss by Amazon, Inc.. (Asfour, Kevin)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/03 2:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Russell Stephen.(Weston, Gregory) (mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Russell Stephen,
Att: 2 Declaration of Gregory S. Weston and Exs. 1-4 thereto,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Friday, May 24, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Lodgment Fri 05/24 7:59 AM
NOTICE of Lodgment by Russell Stephen(Weston, Gregory) **QC Email sent.Proposed orders should not be attached.** (mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
19 19 notice Notice of Lodgment Fri 05/24 7:57 AM
NOTICE of Lodgment by Russell Stephen(Weston, Gregory) ** QC Email sent.Proposed orders should not be attached. **(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Thursday, May 02, 2024
18 18 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/02 12:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the hearing on the motion to change venue (Doc. No.14 ) set for Friday, June 28, 2024, at 1:30 PM is vacated and rescheduled for Monday, June 17, 2024, at 10:30 AM. Further, the hearing on the motion to dismiss (Doc. No.15 ) set for Friday, July 5, 2024, at 1:30 PM is vacated and rescheduled for Monday, June 24, 2024, at 10:30 AM.(no document attached) (rlw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
17 17 order Order of Judge Transfer Wed 05/01 1:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge John A. Houston is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 24cv00546 H-BLM.(no document attached) (bdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
16 16 order Order of Judge Transfer Tue 04/30 9:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 24cv546 JAH-BLM.(no document attached) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/26 5:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amazon, Inc..(Asfour, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit A (to RJN)
14 14 motion Change Venue Fri 04/26 5:45 PM
MOTION to Change Venue by Amazon, Inc..(Asfour, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Moni Lake,
Att: 3 Exhibit A (to Declaration of Moni Lake)
Friday, March 29, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 03/29 9:55 AM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Marvis A. Barnes, re9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/29/2024.(rmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 03/28 4:18 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jennifer Janeira Nagle, re8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/28/2024.(rmc)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 03/28 4:17 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Loly Garcia Tor, re7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/28/2024.(rmc)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 03/28 4:16 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Robert W. Sparkes, III, re6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/28/2024.(rmc)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/28 9:51 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18712206.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Barnes, Marvis) (rmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
8 8 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/26 12:21 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18705243.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Nagle, Jennifer) (rmc)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/26 6:02 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18703078.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Tor, Loly) (rmc)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/26 4:41 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18703069.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sparkes, Robert) (rmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/25 1:28 PM
Order Extending Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.'s Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No.4 ). Answer due 4/26/2024. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/25/24. (jmo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/22 4:31 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to First Amended Complaint by Amazon, Inc..(Asfour, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kevin S. Asfour
3 3 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 03/22 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Amazon, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Asfour, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/22 4:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Asfour, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/22 11:18 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18694283.), filed by Amazon, Inc..
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Original Complaint),
Att: 3 Exhibit B (First Amended Complaint),
Att: 4 Exhibit C (As-Served Summons & First Amended Complaint),
Att: 5 Exhibit D (State Court Record (3.15.24)) The new case number is 3:24-cv-546-GPC-BLM. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(rxc) (sjt).