Illinois Southern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-40008
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 2:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Brandon Zanotti (1)
Represented By
G. Patrick Murphy
Murphy & Murphy, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Hal A. Goldsmith
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/11/2024 3:05 PM CDT
Thursday, March 21, 2024
NOTICE: At the direction of the Judicial Conference of the United States, all plea agreements and sentencing memoranda contain a sealed supplement which is either a statement that there is cooperation, or a statement that there is no cooperation, and, as a result, it is not possible to determine from examination of docket entries whether a defendant did or did not cooperate with the government. (tag)
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Brandon Zanotti (tag)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs INFORMATION as to Brandon Zanotti (tag)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Phil Gilbert: Initial Appearance, Arraignment and Plea to Information Hearing as to Brandon Zanotti held on 3/21/2024. Sentencing is scheduled for 5/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Defendant placed on $1,000 unsecured bond. (Court Reporter Amy Richardson.) (tag)
Related: [-]
5 5 12 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to Brandon Zanotti (tag)
Related: [-]
6 6 SEALED PLEA AGREEMENT SUPPLEMENT as to Brandon Zanotti (tag)
Related: [-]
7 7 4 pgs STIPULATION OF FACTS as to Brandon Zanotti (tag)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs APPEARANCE BOND Entered as to Brandon Zanotti in the amount of $1,000 unsecured. (tag)
Related: [-]