Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00180
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 2:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Benigno Martinez-Garcia (1)
Represented By
Nathan Samuel Janis
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Brownsville
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Asst United States Attorney Br-Mag Duty
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/24/2024 3:58 AM CDT
Thursday, March 21, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 3/21/2024 as to Benigno Martinez-Garcia. Defendant sworn in. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. COUNSEL DETERMINATION HEARING held. Defendant requests court appointed counsel. The defendant testifies to the Court that he cannot afford to hire his own counsel and the Court finds the defendant qualifies for the appoint of counsel. The Court will appoint counsel to represent the defendant. In the event the defendant is able to hire private counsel, deft shall reimburse appointed counsel for costs incurred up to such time that new counsel enters his/her appearance. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 3/27/2024 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. DETENTION HEARING held. Bond set at $25,000 Cash Deposit with the following conditions: Defendant shall first execute an immigration bond and secondly provide sufficient verifiable information demonstrating significant ties to the community, as ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, counsel for the United States is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances: Luis Salazar, AUSA; Angel Olivo-Garcia, AFPD; (USPO:Elizabeth Castillo) (ERO:Bertha Vasquez) (Interpreter:Marco Hanson, not used) (DUSM: R Palomino) (CSO: J Morin) (als1)(9:30-9:41AM)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Benigno Martinez-Garcia (1), filed. (Cameron) (bav1) (sac1).
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Benigno Martinez-Garcia arrested on 3/19/2024, filed. (bav1) (sac1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/21/2024) Unredacted attachment
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Federal Public Defender - Brownsville for Benigno Martinez-Garcia ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1)
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Benigno Martinez-Garcia ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Benigno Martinez-Garcia, filed. (Janis, Nathan)
Related: [-]