Vermont District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00032
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 3:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios (1)
Represented By
Mary M. Nerino, AFPD
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
FPD
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matthew J. Lasher, AUSA
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/24/2024 5:08 AM EDT
Friday, January 05, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios (1). Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 1/5/2024. (drg) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Affidavit of David T. Palczewski
2 2 ORDER Appointing FPD for Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/5/2024. (hbc) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios. (Lasher, Matthew) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Kevin J. Doyle: Initial Appearance as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios held on 1/5/2024. Present are AUSA Matthew Lasher for the gov't, AFPD Barclay Johnson w/ deft, and J. Hansell for the USPO. Maria Jakobeit sworn as Spanish interpreter. Court informs deft of rights. Financial affidavit reviewed. Court makes inquiries and informs deft of the Complaint. Gov't moves for detention and requests a continuance. ORAL ORDER: Consistent with Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f), Court confirms disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland and possible consequences of violating such Order. ORDERED: Court appoints counsel on behalf of deft. Deft remanded to the custody of the US Marshal to be detained pending Detention Hearing set for 1/10/2024 at 2:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (hbc) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios. (Document image is sealed) (hbc) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 1/5/2024. (hbc) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios. Detention Hearing set for 1/10/2024 at 2:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 1/5/2024. (hbc) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
8 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary M. Nerino, AFPD appearing for Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios .(Nerino, Mary) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
9 9 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Kevin J. Doyle: Detention Hearing as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios held on 1/10/2024. Present are AUSA Matthew Lasher for the gov't, AFPD Mary Nerino w/ deft, and J. Hansell for the USPO. Maria Jakobeit sworn as Spanish interpreter. Arguments by counsel. Court makes findings as to threshold matter that a detention hearing is warranted. Deft requests further continuance of hearing and Court finds good cause. ORDERED: Deft remains detained pending continuation of Detention Hearing on 1/17/2024 at 3:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (hbc) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios. Continuation of Detention Hearing set for 1/17/2024 at 3:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 1/10/2024. (hbc) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
11 11 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Kevin J. Doyle: Continuation of Detention Hearing as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios held on 1/17/2024. Present are AUSA Matthew Lasher for the gov't, AFPD Mary Nerino w/ deft, and J. Hansell for the USPO. Maria Jakobeit sworn as Spanish interpreter. Arguments by counsel. Court makes findings. Court takes brief recess to allow parties time to review proposed conditions of release. Court reconvenes. Statements re proposed conditions. Court reviews conditions of release and advises deft of penalties and sanctions. ORDERED:3 MOTION for Detention is denied. Deft is released on PR with conditions. Preliminary Hearing set for 1/24/2024 at 2:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (hbc) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 1/17/2024. (hbc) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
13 13 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios: Preliminary Hearing or Arraignment set for 1/24/2024 at 2:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. (hbc) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
Attorney substitution as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios. Attorney Colin Owyang, AUSA for USA substituted for Attorney Kimberly G. Ang, AUSA pursuant to notification from the U.S. Attorney's Office. (law) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
14 14 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios (Nerino, Mary) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
15 15 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios. (Owyang, Colin) (Main Document 15 replaced on 1/24/2024) (drg). (drg). Proposed Order separated from main document on 1/24/2024 (drg). [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/24/2024) Proposed Order
16 16 APPLICATION for Search Warrant re: Four Smartphones as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios. (drg) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A,
Att: 2 Attachment B,
Att: 3 5 pgs Affidavit of James F. Loomis,
Att: 4 11 pgs Exhibit 1
18 18 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios re:15 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict . Proposed Order separated from Motion. The separated documents are also attached to this entry. (drg) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 ORDER granting15 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios (1). Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 1/24/2024. (drg) [2:24-mj-00002-kjd]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
20 20 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to Luis Fernando Barragan-Palacios (1) count(s) 1, 2. (eh)
Related: [-]