Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-08664
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Terminated:Mar 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 12:46 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Adan Ramos-Romero (1)
Terminated: 03/04/2024
Represented By
James Daniel Smith
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/24/2024 3:13 AM MST
Thursday, February 22, 2024
Arrest of Adan Ramos-Romero on 2/22/2024. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Adan Ramos-Romero. (JAM)
Related: [-]