Che et al v. Jaddou et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Myong J Joun |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10759 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:0701 Maritime Subsidy Board |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 1:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
Director Ur M Jaddou
|
|
Defendant
Patrick Lechleitner
|
|
Plaintiff
Xiaoyan Che
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xinlu Guo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/03 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Ur M Jaddou, Patrick Lechleitner (Sady, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/01 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Pratt on behalf of Xiaoyan Che, Xinlu Guo (Pratt, John) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/01 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward F. Ramos on behalf of Xiaoyan Che, Xinlu Guo (Ramos, Edward) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Thu 03/28 11:38 AM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John P. Pratt and Edward F. Ramos. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/25 1:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Ur M Jaddou, Patrick Lechleitner. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
5 | 5
order
General Order 19-02
Mon 03/25 1:35 PM
General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 03/25 1:34 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Myong J. Joun assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice for Social Security and Immigration Cases
Mon 03/25 12:53 PM
Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
Sunday, March 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Sun 03/24 7:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John P. Pratt, Edward F. Ramos Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number AMADC-10331795 by Xiaoyan Che, Xinlu Guo.(Romanovsky, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Admittee Declarations | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 03/24 7:20 PM
COMPLAINT under Administrative Procedure Act against Patrick Lechleitner, Ur M Jaddou Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10331794 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Xiaoyan Che, Xinlu Guo.(Romanovsky, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - IJ Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - IJ Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Post-order instructions, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Category Form |