Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:24-cv-10744
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Interested Party
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable

GPO Mar 28 2025
OPINION AND ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT denying 9 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DAll)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
15 15 14 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 03/28 10:29 AM
OPINION AND ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT denying9 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DAll)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 11/05 9:58 AM
REPLY to Response re9 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald Downey, Jr.. (Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
order Text-Only Order Fri 10/25 3:04 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Unopposed) filed by Ronald Downey, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DAll)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Social Security Deadlines Fri 10/25 3:05 PM
Set/Reset Social Security Deadlines Plaintiff Reply due by 11/8/2024 (DAll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 10/17 1:59 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Unopposed) by Ronald Downey, Jr.. (Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Fri 10/11 11:18 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Social Security, Commissioner of. (Muir, Chad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
order Text-Only Order ~Util - Set Social Security Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 09/11 12:09 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting Defendant's11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment ., ( Defendant Response and Motion due by 10/11/2024 , Plaintiff Reply due by 10/25/2024 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (JOwe)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 09/09 10:47 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Social Security, Commissioner of. (Muir, Chad)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Appearance Mon 09/09 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Muir on behalf of Social Security, Commissioner of. (Muir, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
9 9 motion Summary Judgment Fri 08/09 10:13 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ronald Downey, Jr.. (Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
8 8 misc Joint Statement Regarding Consent Mon 06/24 5:29 PM
Joint Statement Regarding Consent: Parties consent to the magistrate judge as presider. (Ridgell-Boltz, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
7 7 order Consent to MJ and Setting Motion Deadlines Tue 06/18 10:20 AM
ORDER REGARDING CONSENT TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE and Setting Motion Deadlines. Plaintiff Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/12/2024 Defendant Response and Motion due by 9/11/2024 Plaintiff Reply due by 9/24/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DPer)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order ~Util - Set Social Security Deadlines Tue 06/18 8:36 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. ( Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/12/2024 , Defendant's Response and Motion due by 9/11/2024 , Plaintiff's Reply due by 9/25/2024 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DPer)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 06/17 3:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Unopposed) by Ronald Downey, Jr.. (Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
5 5 misc Transcript of Social Security Proceedings Wed 05/29 11:54 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Social Security Proceedings (Toomey, Zak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Administrative Record
Friday, May 24, 2024
4 4 notice Appearance Fri 05/24 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zak Toomey on behalf of Social Security, Commissioner of. (Toomey, Zak)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
3 3 notice Appearance Mon 04/29 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Ridgell-Boltz on behalf of Social Security, Commissioner of. (Ridgell-Boltz, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 03/25 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Houle on behalf of Ronald Downey, Jr.. (Houle, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 03/25 9:35 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Ronald Downey, Jr. against Commissioner of Social Security. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9723016 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Roscommon - County Where Action Arose: Roscommon - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of New SSA Case Filing Mon 03/25 1:42 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of New Case Filing to Social Security Administration's Office of the General Counsel and the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Michigan. (MSyl)
Related: [-]