Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc. v. Delaware Building Systems, Inc.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Benita Y Pearson |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00541 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 12:26 PM EDT |
Defendant
Delaware Building Systems, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.
3611 Chester Ave.
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Leave
Fri 04/26 12:22 PM
Motion for leave to plead to attain counsel, filed by Defendant Delaware Building Systems, Inc.. (L,MI) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Default Entered
Fri 04/26 10:24 AM
Default Entered on 4/26/2024 against Defendant Delaware Building Systems, Inc. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Judy L. Guyer, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s)1 ,5 . (JLG) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Fri 04/26 10:26 AM
Copy of6 Default Entered mailed to Defendant Delaware Building Systems, Inc., c/o David Overcasher, 4303 Mapleton St. SE, Canton, OH 44707-1939 on 4/26/2024. Related document(s)6 . (JLG) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Application to Enter Default
Thu 04/25 4:05 PM
Application to Clerk for entry of default against Delaware Building Systems, Inc. filed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. (Henzi, Matthew) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 04/01 7:35 AM
Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Delaware Building Systems, Inc. on 3/29/2024, filed on behalf of Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc. Related document(s)1 ,2 ,3 . Summons were not issued by the Clerk. (Henzi, Matthew) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Mon 03/25 12:17 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Delaware Building Systems, Inc. (B,DL) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event)
Mon 03/25 10:28 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc.. (Henzi, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 10:26 AM
Complaint against Delaware Building Systems, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 405.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12473337. Filed by Ohio & Vicinity Carpenters' Fringe Benefit Funds, Inc. (Henzi, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Mon 03/25 12:09 PM
Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (B,DL) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/25 12:10 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (B,DL) |