Fountain Vu LLC
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Tiffany P Geyer |
Case #: | 6:24-bk-01426 |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Fountain Vu LLC
728 Hardman Dr
Orlando, FL 32806-2209 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Thu 04/25 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
Tue 04/23 5:39 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: APPEARANCES : Jeffrey Ainsworth: Debtor Attorney; Audrey Aleskovsky: U.S. Trustee; RULING: Initial Status Conference: Continued to Status Conference on June 18, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. (AOCNFNG); (dh). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
court
Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)
Mon 04/22 5:29 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. The Notice of Bankruptcy Case was not served on additional Creditor . (Tonya) |
|
trustee
(NO PAPER) - Chapter 11 - Continuance of Meeting of Creditors
Mon 04/22 11:44 AM
The United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and continued to the following date to allow further examination of the debtor(s) and/or the records of the debtor(s). Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/7/2024 at 10:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. (Aleskovsky, Audrey) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Fri 04/19 9:23 PM
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors , List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities , Schedules A - H, Includes addition or deletion of creditors, or executory contract entity/leaseholders, or co-debtors to Schedules or Change in the Amount or Classification of Debts. Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Statement of Financial Affairs , List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Fountain Vu LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Fri 04/19 9:27 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Schedules (all schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)([LINK:6:24-bk-01426-TPG] ) [misc,schaja] ( 34.00). Receipt Number A75165191, Amount Paid $ 34.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/16 12:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel Filed by Jacob D Flentke on behalf of Debtor Fountain Vu LLC. (Flentke, Jacob) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Proof of Service (BK)
Thu 04/11 4:32 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Fountain Vu LLC . (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules, Statements, Plans
Tue 04/09 9:27 AM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules and Statements (Extended to April 19, 2024) Service Instructions: Jeffrey Ainsworth is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Cathy P.) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules, Statements, Ch. 12 or Ch. 13 Plan
Fri 04/05 9:47 PM
|
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/05 2:22 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel Filed by Keenan David Smith on behalf of Creditor D&S Investment Capital, LLC. (Smith, Keenan) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/05 2:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael A Nardella on behalf of Creditor D&S Investment Capital, LLC. (Nardella, Michael) |
|
Sunday, March 31, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (BK)
Mon 04/01 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing . Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
Notice of Hearing / Status Conference / Reaffirmation Hearing
Fri 03/29 10:02 AM
Notice of Initial Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2024 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Tonya) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Fri 03/29 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 03/28/2024. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 03/29 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 03/28/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary
Thu 03/28 4:52 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Fountain Vu LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 03/28 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 03/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)
Tue 03/26 3:22 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Schedules and Summary of Assets Not Filed. Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed. Case Management Summary Not Filed. . (Deborah K.) |
|
7 | 7
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Tue 03/26 3:16 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/22/2024 at 09:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 6/3/2024. (Deborah K.) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only)
Mon 03/25 2:14 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Audrey M Aleskovsky on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Aleskovsky, Audrey) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
Mon 03/25 11:58 AM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Certification of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition
Mon 03/25 11:19 AM
Certification of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Fountain Vu LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 03/25 11:14 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel for Purposes of CM/ECF Filed by Robert B Branson on behalf of Debtor Fountain Vu LLC. (Branson, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Mon 03/25 10:55 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Fountain Vu LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/25 10:53 AM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Fountain Vu LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/23/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 07/23/2024. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Mon 03/25 11:09 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:24-bk-01426] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A74904619, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Mon 03/25 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |