Petron, L.L.C. v. National Oilwell Varco, L.P. et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert R Summerhays |
Referred: | Carol B Whitehurst |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00417 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Iberia Parish Clerk of Court, 141860 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 11:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Containment Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Fiber Glass Systems, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Oilwell Varco, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Petron, L.L.C.
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 4:27 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fiber Glass Systems L P, National Oilwell Varco L P. (aty,Longman, Douglas) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 4:25 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fiber Glass Systems L P, National Oilwell Varco L P identifying Other Affiliate Grant Prideco Inc, Other Affiliate NOW Oilfield Services for Fiber Glass Systems L P, National Oilwell Varco L P. (aty,Longman, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/03 2:56 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Fiber Glass Systems L P, National Oilwell Varco L P.(aty,Longman, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Removal Order
Tue 03/26 2:21 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/26/2024. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Tue 03/26 9:39 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/26/2024. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Tue 03/26 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Douglas C Longman, Jr on behalf of Fiber Glass Systems L P, National Oilwell Varco L P AND Bonita K Preuett-Armour on behalf of Petron L L C. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 4/9/2024. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Tue 03/26 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Douglas C Longman, Jr on behalf of Fiber Glass Systems L P, National Oilwell Varco L P. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/9/2024. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/25 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC Iberia Parish, Case Number 141860 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5894504) filed by Fiber Glass Systems, L.P., National Oilwell Varco, L.P..(Attorney Douglas C Longman, Jr added to party Fiber Glass Systems, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas C Longman, Jr added to party National Oilwell Varco, L.P.(pty:dft))(aty,Longman, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit A - State Court Pleading, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit List of Parties and Pleadings, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Filing, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Certificate of Filing, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 6 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/26 9:33 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M) |