Knudson v. 3M Company et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Joan N Ericksen |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01055 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 11:26 AM CDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Arizant Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Irene Knudson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/05 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W. Hulse on behalf of All Defendants. (Hulse, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
MDL Pretrial Order
Tue 03/26 2:52 PM
MDL PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1: Establishing Procedures. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016.(kt) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel to Comply with Pretrial Orders in Main MDL Case
Tue 03/26 2:51 PM
(Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file IN RE: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Bair MDL website at:[LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/mdl-cases] . (kt) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/26 2:50 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (kt) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 03/26 2:47 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-1055 JNE/DTS. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kt) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 9:58 AM
COMPLAINT Irene Knudson against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10927181) filed by Irene Knudson. Filer requests summons issued. (Assaad, Gabriel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |