Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-21402

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey L Meisel
Case #: 2:24-ap-01157
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Terminated:Jul 25, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
TD Bank NA
1701 Marlton Pike East
Cherry Hill, NJ 08034
Represented By
TD Bank NA
contact info
Plaintiff
IQ Dental Supply, LLC
353 Route 46W Building C Unit 120
Fairfield, NJ 07004
Represented By
Richard D. Trenk
Trenk Isabel Siddiqi & Shahdanian P.C.
contact info
Robert S. Roglieri
Trenk Isabel Siddiqi & Shahdanian P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, July 25, 2024
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 07/25 2:03 PM
Adversary Case (2:24-ap-1157) Closed. (ntp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Wed 07/24 12:45 PM
Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Robert S. Roglieri on behalf of IQ Dental Supply, LLC. (Roglieri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
court Hearing Held Tue 07/23 9:12 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Settled Related [+] (ntp)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued to IQ Dental Supply, LLC for Service on TD Bank NA Answer due on 4/24/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 5/28/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attachments)
Monday, July 22, 2024
12 12 misc Document Mon 07/22 4:50 PM
Document re: Letter Regarding Settlement of Adversary Proceeding filed by Robert S. Roglieri on behalf of IQ Dental Supply, LLC. (Roglieri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
11 11 court Determination of Adjournment Request Mon 07/08 5:18 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 07/23/2024 at 11:00 a.m.. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (omf)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Appearance and Request filed by Plaintiff IQ Dental Supply, LLC, Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 07/08 5:18 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 7/09/2024 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued to IQ Dental Supply, LLC for Service on TD Bank NA Answer due on 4/24/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 5/28/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attachments)
Friday, June 28, 2024
10 10 court Determination of Adjournment Request Fri 06/28 2:21 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 07/09/2024. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (omf)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Fri 06/28 2:22 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 07/02/2024 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued to IQ Dental Supply, LLC for Service on TD Bank NA Answer due on 4/24/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 5/28/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attachments)
Monday, June 17, 2024
9 9 court Determination of Adjournment Request Mon 06/17 4:35 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 07/02/2024 at 11:30 a.m.. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (omf)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 06/17 4:36 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 6/18/2024 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/02/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued to IQ Dental Supply, LLC for Service on TD Bank NA Answer due on 4/24/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 5/28/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attachments)
Monday, June 10, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/10 2:05 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Julie F. Montgomery on behalf of TD Bank NA. (Montgomery, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 03, 2024
utility Set/Reset/Satisfy Deadline(s) - Adversary Answer Mon 06/03 4:20 PM
Answer Deadline Set/Reset/Satisfied Related [+]. Answer due by 6/10/2024. (ntp)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff IQ Dental Supply, LLC,7 Stipulation filed by Defendant TD Bank NA
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 06/03 4:22 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing Rescheduled from 6/4/2024 Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued to IQ Dental Supply, LLC for Service on TD Bank NA Answer due on 4/24/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 5/28/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attachments)
Thursday, May 30, 2024
7 7 misc Stipulation Thu 05/30 2:22 PM
Stipulation Between TD Bank NA and Plaintiff's Counsel, Robert S. Roglieri, Esquire, re:Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint as to TD Bank, N.A Related [+] filed by Julie F. Montgomery on behalf of TD Bank NA. (Montgomery, Julie)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff IQ Dental Supply, LLC
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 23, 2024
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Thu 05/23 10:08 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Julie F. Montgomery on behalf of TD Bank NA. (Montgomery, Julie)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset/Satisfy Deadline(s) - Adversary Answer Thu 05/23 3:55 PM
Answer Deadline Set/Reset/Satisfied Related [+]. Answer due by 5/30/2024. (ntp)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff IQ Dental Supply, LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 05/23 3:56 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing Rescheduled from 5/28/2024 Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued to IQ Dental Supply, LLC for Service on TD Bank NA Answer due on 4/24/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 5/28/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attachments)
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 05/22 4:53 PM
Stipulation Between IQ Dental Supply, LLC and TD Bank, re:Extending Time to Answer Complaint Related [+] filed by Robert S. Roglieri on behalf of IQ Dental Supply, LLC. (Roglieri, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff IQ Dental Supply, LLC
Thursday, March 28, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/28 12:49 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Richard D. Trenk on behalf of IQ Dental Supply, LLC. (Trenk, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff IQ Dental Supply, LLC,3 Summons Issued
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Tue 03/26 9:38 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 24-01157 SLM] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46554677, fee amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, March 25, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 03/25 9:47 AM
Summons Issued to IQ Dental Supply, LLC for Service on TD Bank NA Answer due on 4/24/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 5/28/2024 at 11:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachments
Friday, March 22, 2024
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Fri 03/22 2:24 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Richard D. Trenk on behalf of IQ Dental Supply, LLC. (Trenk, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/22 1:58 PM
Adversary case 24-01157 Complaint by IQ Dental Supply, LLC against TD Bank NA. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Roglieri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A