Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-22667

Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Carlota M Bohm
Case #: 2:24-ap-02019
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Terminated:May 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES , INC.
P.O. BOX 57071
IRVINE, CA 92619
Represented By
CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES , INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey A. Carter
310 W. Poland Ave.
Bessemer, PA 16112
Represented By
Glenn R. Bartifay
contact info
Plaintiff
Courtney E. Carter
310 W. Poland Ave.
Bessemer, PA 16112
Represented By
Glenn R. Bartifay
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
9 9 court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Wed 05/29 12:51 PM
Disposition of Adversary, Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2019 Closed. (obro)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 11, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 05/12 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :7 Order -Non-motion related-
Thursday, May 09, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order -Non-motion related- Thu 05/09 1:41 PM
Consent Order Approving Secured amount due to creditor. Signed on 5/9/2024. Related [+]. (obro)
Related: [-] :1 Complaint,6 Consent
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
6 6 misc Consent Wed 05/08 12:14 PM
Proposed Consent Order Filed by Plaintiffs Courtney E. Carter, Jeffrey A. Carter Related [+]. (Bartifay, Glenn)
Related: [-] :1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey A. Carter, Plaintiff Courtney E. Carter
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/24 1:31 PM
Answer to Complaint Regarding the Hearing on no hearing date scheduled. Filed by CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC.(Ebeck, Keri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/16 10:27 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Keri P. Ebeck Filed by on behalf of CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC.. (Ebeck, Keri)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/26 11:15 AM
Summons Service Executed on CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC. 3/26/2024 . (Bartifay, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 03/25 10:39 AM
One Summons Issued on CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC. Date Issued 3/25/2024, Answer Due 4/24/2024. (jhel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/22 5:45 PM
Adversary case 24-02019 Complaint to Determine Value Under 11 USCA Section 506 by Jeffrey A. Carter, Courtney E. Carter against CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC.. Receipt Number NFR, Fee Amount $ 350. Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Bartifay, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order