Mann v. Lindsey et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Marcia Morales Howard |
Referred: | Joel B Toomey |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00298 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/03 10:33 AM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 5/1/2024; with directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/2/2024. (HM) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/02 11:36 AM
ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and assessing the $350 filing fee; striking 3 Plaintiff's Affidavit; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/2/2024. (CAW) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Standing Order - Pro Se Litigants
Mon 04/01 3:56 PM
NOTICE to pro se litigant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/1/2024. (CAW) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit
Thu 03/28 2:22 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Gerard Jamar Mann by Gerard Jamar Mann. (Chambers Notified) (BD) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/25 1:38 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Gerard Jamar Mann.(BD) |
|
Att: 1 Inmate Account Statement | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 1:35 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gerard Jamar Mann. (No service copies) (BD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope |