Ariza v. Godwin's Gatorland, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Byron |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00579 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Godwin's Gatorland, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Victor Ariza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/26 8:40 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Godwin's Gatorland, Inc. answer or response due 5/17/2024. No further extensions of this deadline will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Future extension motions in this case shall be filed more than three business days before the expiring deadline and must demonstrate the movant's diligence in meeting the deadline in addition to good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 4/26/2024. (JBS) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Thu 04/25 11:46 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Godwin's Gatorland, Inc. (Rhoden, Rebecca) Modified text and event type on 4/25/2024 (GL) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 04/25 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Rebecca E. Rhoden on behalf of Godwin's Gatorland, Inc. Lead Counsel: Rebecca E. Rhoden. (Rhoden, Rebecca) Modified text on 4/25/2024 (GL) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of appearance
Thu 04/25 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca E. Rhoden on behalf of Godwin's Gatorland, Inc. (Rhoden, Rebecca) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons returned executed
Tue 04/09 11:40 AM
RETURN of service executed on 04/05/2024 by Victor Ariza as to Godwin's Gatorland, Inc.. (Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Mon 04/08 4:17 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Victor Ariza. Related case(s): No (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 4:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Interested Persons Order by Victor Ariza. (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Tue 03/26 10:24 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Godwin's Gatorland, Inc. (MCB) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Interested Persons Order
Mon 03/25 4:19 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/25/2024. (KM) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/25 3:27 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-579-PGB-RMN. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 12:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Godwin's Gatorland, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21905347) filed by Victor Ariza.(Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons |