Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Kathryn Kimball Mizelle |
Referred: | Sean P Flynn |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00737 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 9:18 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Waugh, Christian) Modified text on 4/10/2024 (ABM) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/04 5:37 PM
ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/4/2024. (ACS) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Thu 04/04 1:10 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff's 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement fails to meet the standards this Court requires to effectively screen cases for potential conflicts. The Court requires parties to disclose "ownership however small of a party's shares or stock," not simply those whose ownership constitutes 10% or more. See (Doc. 5 ) at 7. Plaintiff must file a new statement using the form attached to the 5 Civil Case Order (also available on the undersigned's website) by April 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/4/2024. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/4/2024. (ZG) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/03 1:40 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Williamson, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Subpoena | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/02 4:26 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Waugh, Christian) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Standing Order
Wed 03/27 10:45 AM
CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. The Parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within forty days after any Defendant appears. Each Party must also file a Corporate Disclosure Statement using the standard template attached to this Order (also available on the undersigned's website under the "forms" tab) within fourteen days after appearing. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/27/2024. (ZG) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Copyright Report
Tue 03/26 3:30 PM
Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (LAB) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/25 2:19 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:24-cv-737-KKM-SPF. (AJS) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Mon 03/25 12:29 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Waugh, Christian) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 12:26 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21905543) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Infringement Log |