Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 35.139.206.244
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Merryday |
Referred: | Natalie Hirt Adams |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00740 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/04 9:03 AM
ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams on 4/4/2024. (CJF) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/03 1:42 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Williamson, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Subpoena | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/02 4:27 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Waugh, Christian) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Copyright Report
Tue 03/26 4:42 PM
Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (EAM) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 03/26 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2). -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/25 4:38 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:24-cv-740-SDM-NHA. (TNP) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Mon 03/25 1:27 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Waugh, Christian) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 1:24 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21905953) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Infringement Log |