Law v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Western District Court | |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00258 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 04/04 3:31 PM
Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number 100004245 (CGJ) |
||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/01 3:42 PM
TEXT ORDER denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as incomplete. Plaintiff indicates that she is not employed and receives government assistance that covers her food expenses. She also indicates that she lives with her son, who pays her bills. Plaintiff estimates her monthly household expenses to be $1,145.00, but her application is silent as to the exact amount of assistance she receives from her son as paragraph #10 requires. Based on the lack of sufficient information, the Court cannot determine whether plaintiff has set forth sufficient indications of indigency, thus, plaintiff's in forma pauperis motion is DENIED. Plaintiff has until May 1, 2024, to (1) re-file her application using the Court's standard form with all of the relevant information included, or (2) pay the $405.00 filing fee. If plaintiff has not complied with either of these options by May 1. 2024, the Clerk of Court is directed to dismiss this case without prejudice and without further order. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 4/1/24. (NNR) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/26 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Corona on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Corona, Michael) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/26 11:46 AM
Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (TMK) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/26 11:47 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK) |
||
service
Social Security Appeal Notice re Service
Tue 03/26 11:48 AM
NOTICE regarding service of1 Complaint, in a Social Security case: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 5/28/2024. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk issues this Notice of Electronic Filing to the Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of New York. No summons will issue. (TMK) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/25 12:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Trisha Law.(Comerford, Ida) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 12:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Trisha Law.(Comerford, Ida) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 WITHDRAWL OF CONSENT OF MAGISTRATE |