Strike 3 Holdings LLC v. Doe
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Lioi |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00546 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 2:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for leave
Wed 04/17 11:10 AM
Memorandum Opinion and Order . Plaintiff's6 motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference is granted with certain limitations outlined in the attached order. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 4/17/2024. (V,A) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Leave
Wed 04/03 12:03 PM
Motion for leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of David Williamson, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Patrick Paige, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Susan Stalzer, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake
Mon 03/25 12:57 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (B,DL) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Order - Judge Lioi
Mon 03/25 12:53 PM
Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/25/2024. (B,DL) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A - Witness List, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix B - Exhibit List | ||
3 | 3
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event)
Mon 03/25 12:29 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems LLC for Strike 3 Holdings LLC filed by Strike 3 Holdings LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
2 | 2
oth_doc
Report Regarding Copyright Action - AO121
Mon 03/25 12:28 PM
Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by Strike 3 Holdings LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Works List | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 12:28 PM
Complaint-Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement with jury demand against John Doe. Filing fee paid $ 405.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12473859. Filed by Strike 3 Holdings LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Works List, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Mon 03/25 12:51 PM
Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (B,DL) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/25 12:52 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (B,DL) |