Colorado District Court
Judge:Robert E Blackburn
Case #: 1:24-cv-00819
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2024
Terminated:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2024 3:14 AM MDT
Defendant
Doctors Property Management, LLC
Represented By
Neil Patrick Cherubin
Tueller & Gibbs LLC
contact info
Defendant
Haven CB, LLC
a Limited Liability Company 69 Barbra Place
Crested Butte, CO 81224
Defendant
Robert Justin Marting
Represented By
Neil Patrick Cherubin
Tueller & Gibbs LLC
contact info
Defendant
Constance Apryl Zimmer
an Individual 69 Barbra Place
Crested Butte, CO 81224
Plaintiff
Priscilla A Hodges
Represented By
Christopher D. Mochulsky
Smolen Law, PLLC
contact info
Donald E. Smolen, II
Smolen Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, December 16, 2024
51 51 misc Mail Returned Mon 12/16 3:22 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re:49 Order on Report and Recommendations,50 Judgment Addressed to Haven CB, LLC. (efoga, )
Related: [-]