California Southern District Court
Judge:Benjamin J Cheeks
Referred: Michael S Berg
Case #: 3:24-cv-00562
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1988 Proceedings in Vindication of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2024
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2024 3:33 AM PDT
Defendant
City of San Diego, California
Represented By
Benjamin P. Syz
Office Of The San Diego City Attorney
contact info
Michael Travis Phelps
Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
All Peoples Church
Represented By
Elizabeth Linh Tran
Lurie, Zepeda, Schmalz, Hogan & Martin
contact info
Andrew W Zepeda
Lurie And Zepeda
contact info
Daniel P. Dalton
Dalton & Tomich, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 03/13 12:03 PM
Order Granting Joint Stipulation To Dismiss With Prejudice [ECF No.25 ]. Signed by District Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks on 3/12/2024. (dim)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Vacated Hearing(s) Wed 03/12 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Vacated Hearings: Per the parties' Notice of Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal [ECF No. 25], the Court VACATES the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2025. (no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Dismiss Wed 03/12 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal by All Peoples Church re23 Order on Motion to Continue(Dalton, Daniel) Modified to be made a motion and QC Mailer sent re: Proposed order should not be filed on docket on 3/12/2025 (dim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice Proposed Order of Dismissal
Friday, January 24, 2025
24 24 order Order of Judge Transfer Fri 01/24 4:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Todd W. Robinson is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24cv562 BJC-MSB.(no document attached) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 01/23 2:00 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Continue. Early Neutral Evaluation continued from 02/07/2025 to 3/12/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 1/23/2025. (sjt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
22 22 motion Continue Wed 01/22 1:57 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by City of San Diego, California.(Syz, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, October 21, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 10/21 12:01 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Continue. Early Neutral Evaluation continued to 2/7/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 10/21/2024. (sjt)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Continue Mon 10/21 10:38 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by All Peoples Church. (Dalton, Daniel) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
19 19 minutes Status Conference Thu 10/10 10:04 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Status Conference held on 10/10/2024. The parties shall file a joint motion to continue the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by 10/24/2024.(Plaintiff Attorney Daniel P. Dalton). (Defendant Attorney Benjamin P. Syz). (no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Change of Hearing Mon 10/07 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Change of Hearing:The Court CONVERTS the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference currently set for 10/10/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg to a Telephonic Status Conference. Plaintiff's counsel shall coordinate a joint call with chambers at 619-557-6632. (no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
17 17 minutes ~Util - Set Hearings Status Conference Fri 08/02 10:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Telephonic status conference held on 8/2/2024. Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference RESET for 10/10/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg.(Plaintiff Attorney Daniel P. Dalton). (Defendant Attorney Benjamin P. Syz). (no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
16 16 order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 07/30 4:17 PM
ORDER: The Court CONVERTS the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference currently set for 8/2/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg to a Telephonic Status Conference. Plaintiff's counsel shall coordinate a joint call with chambers at 619-557-6632. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/30/2024.(no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
15 15 misc Mail Returned Wed 07/24 10:59 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 14 Status Conference. Mail sent to Andrew W Zepeda Lurie and Zepeda 9107 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 800 Beverly Hills, CA 90210-5533. (rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
14 14 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 07/03 11:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/3/2024. Judge Berg spoke with the parties concerning the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference currently set for July 9, 2024. Due to a conflict in the courts calendar, the ENE/CMC is CONTINUED to August 2, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. The Pre-ENE Status Conference set for July 8, 2024 is VACATED. (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel P. Dalton). (Defendant Attorney Benjamin P. Syz). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 07/03 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/3/2024 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Plaintiff's counsel shall coordinate a joint call with chambers at 619-557-6632.(no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
12 12 notice Joint Discovery Plan Tue 07/02 7:56 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by All Peoples Church (Dalton, Daniel) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
11 11 misc Mail Returned Wed 05/08 12:33 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re7 Order re Pro Hac Vice Application. Mail sent to Andrew W. Zepeda 9107 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 800 Beverly Hills, CA 90210. (exs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/30 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN THE OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY by City of San Diego, California(Syz, Benjamin)Attorney Benjamin P. Syz added to party City of San Diego, California(pty:dft) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, April 29, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 04/30 10:22 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Continue. Joint Discovery Plan now due 7/2/2024 Case Management Conference reset for 7/9/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Early Neutral Evaluation reset for 7/9/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Status Conference reset for 7/8/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 4/29/2024. (sjt)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Continue Mon 04/29 1:50 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by All Peoples Church. (Dalton, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 04/18 3:57 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Daniel P. Dalton Related [+]. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/18/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
Related: [-] ECF No.6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
6 6 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/18 10:01 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $224.00 receipt number ACASDC-18770551.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Dalton, Daniel)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
5 5 6 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Tue 04/16 11:42 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/31/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Status Conference set for 5/28/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Joint Discovery Plan due 5/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 4/16/2024.(sjt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/15 12:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by City of San Diego, California.(Phelps, Michael)Attorney Michael Travis Phelps added to party City of San Diego, California(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, March 28, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/28 1:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Peoples Church. City of San Diego, California served. (Tran, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 03/25 11:51 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (stn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/25 11:46 AM
COMPLAINT - and Petition for Writ of Mandate with Jury Demand against City of San Diego, California ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18699109.), filed by All Peoples Church. The new case number is 3:24-cv-562-TWR-MSB. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Andrew W. Zepeda)(stn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C