Mahan v. Health Options, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Corrigan |
Referred: | Laura Lothman Lambert |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00302 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 5:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
Health Options, Inc. d/b/a Florida Blue HMO an HMO affiliate of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Troy Mahan
8950 SW 74th Court Suite 2201
Miami, FL 33156 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons issued
Fri 04/19 3:13 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Health Options, Inc.. (JDR) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 03/27 8:39 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 03/26 3:55 PM
Entered in error. (TPL) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/26 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report. As this is an ERISA case, please use the attached CMR form. The CMR must be filed within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court. (TPL) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/26 8:49 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:24-cv-302-TJC-LLL. (RLK) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Health Options, Inc. d/b/a Florida Blue HMO an HMO affiliate of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Troy Mahan.(Santi, Maria) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit Policy, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Health Options, Inc. d/b/a Florida Blue HMO an HMO affiliate of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21907144) filed by Troy Mahan.(Santi, Maria) |