Raby v. Evolv Technologies Holdings, Inc. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Allison D Burroughs |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10761 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 7:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kevin Charlton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Adam Deutsch
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Donohue
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Peter George
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mario Ramos
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Evolv Technologies Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Raby
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Tue 04/16 10:10 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered APPROVING6 Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order. (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Mon 04/15 12:15 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Scheduling Order , Waiver of Service by Kevin Charlton, Adam Deutsch, Mark Donohue, Evolv Technologies Holdings, Inc., Peter George, Mario Ramos. (Trach, William) Modified on 4/16/2024 to add waiver of service to docket text (McManus, Caetlin). |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 12:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evolv Technologies Holdings, Inc.. (Trach, William) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Trach on behalf of Kevin Charlton, Adam Deutsch, Mark Donohue, Evolv Technologies Holdings, Inc., Peter George, Mario Ramos (Trach, William) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/26 12:04 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 03/26 10:28 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
39
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10333568 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Gerald Raby.(Baker, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit PSLRA Certification, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form |