Garcia v. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Denise J Casper |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10762 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Commonwealth of Massachusetts Superior Court, 2473CV00054 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 5:17 PM EDT |
Defendant
TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL NO. 59
DINSMORE & SHOHL, LLP
101 Arch Street, Suite 1800, MA 02110 |
|
Defendant
UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC
DINSMORE & SHOHL, LLP
01 Arch Street, Suite 1800, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Garcia
Suisman, Shapiro, Wool, Brennan, Gray, and Greenberg, P.C.
2 Union Plaza, Suite 200, CT 06320 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 11:52 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Allison L. Goico Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10382736 by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Flores, Javier) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Allison L. Goico | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 11:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jonathan M. Kelly Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10382584 by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Flores, Javier) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jonathan M. Kelly | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 04/19 10:01 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting11 Motion for Extension of Time Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2024 02:45 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the sessions courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Courts general orders and public notices available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 04/18 12:40 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 6, 2024 for the Scheduling Conference by Teamsters Union Local No. 59.(Najjar, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/16 11:38 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with exhibits now attached by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Flores, Javier) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/16/2024 - removed blank pages) (Cook, Savannah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/12 12:37 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: Standing Order Regarding Appearance of Counsel Via Telephone or Video Conference (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
8 | 8
order
Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys
Fri 04/12 12:36 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Scheduling Conference
Fri 04/12 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2024 03:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/11 12:33 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Teamsters Union Local No. 59.(Najjar, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Notice of Service of Process
Mon 04/08 1:13 PM
Notice of Service of Process filed by Alan Garcia. Individual(s)/Entities served: Teamsters Union Local 59. (Raymond, Laura) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/01 1:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Flores, Javier) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Tue 03/26 12:10 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 03/26 10:31 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/25 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10333668 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Flores, Javier) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Category Form |