Hendershot v. Power Home Solar, LLC, et al.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John R Adams |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00554 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Tuscarawas County Court of Common Pleas, 2024CV020149 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 5:14 PM EDT |
Defendant
Digital Federal Credit Union
|
|
Defendant
Paul Grysiuk
|
|
Defendant
Jake Hines
|
|
Defendant
Power Home Solar LLC
|
|
Defendant
Trivest Partners, L.P.
550 South Dixie Highway, Suite 300
Coral Gables, FL 33146 |
|
Defendant
Jayson Waller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Hendershot
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for order
Thu 04/11 8:21 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting the parties' joint Motion and adopting their briefing schedule. Judge John R. Adams on 4/11/2024.(L,J) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
5
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 04/09 4:18 PM
Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule On Amended Complaint and Certain Motions filed by Defendant Jayson Waller. Related document(s)8 ,9 ,10 .(Lewis, Patrick) Modified text on 4/9/2024 (B,DL) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stay
Wed 04/03 1:39 PM
Motion to stay Briefing on Pending Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Robert Hendershot. Related document(s)4 ,5 .(Burton, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
motion
Remand to State Court
Wed 04/03 1:38 PM
Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Robert Hendershot.(Burton, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- July 31, 2023 Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B- September 22, 2023 Order | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 04/03 1:37 PM
First Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Robert Hendershot. (Burton, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Orders, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Sales Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C- August 2022 Letter | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
Tue 04/02 8:58 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting3 Defendant's Motion for for extension of time until 4/22/2024 to answer. Digital Federal Credit Union answer due 4/22/2024. Judge John R. Adams on 4/2/2024.(L,J) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event)
Mon 04/01 4:21 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Trivest Partners, L.P.. (Covey, Trevor) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/01 4:17 PM
Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Trivest Partners, L.P.. Related document(s)1 . (Covey, Trevor) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 04/01 3:22 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim the Complaint filed by Defendant Jayson Waller. Related document(s)1 .(Lewis, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - McConville v. Power Home Solar Decision | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension (answer complaint)
Mon 04/01 3:09 PM
Motion for extension of time until 4/22/2024 to answer filed by Defendant Digital Federal Credit Union.(Weigand, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake
Mon 03/25 5:01 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,DL) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/25 4:22 PM
Notice of Removal from Tuscarawas County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024 CV 02 0149. Filing fee paid $ 405.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12474812. Filer has indicated that case may be related to terminated civil action 5:22-cv-01238 . Filed by Jayson Waller. (Lewis, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 84 pgs Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Court Order and Exhibit B to Bankruptcy Motion | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Mon 03/25 4:55 PM
Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (B,DL) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/25 4:56 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (B,DL) |